EP3185272 - INSTALLATION DEVICE WITH AN ARRANGEMENT FOR DRIVING A BI-STABLE RELAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2017/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hozoi, Adrian Am Rheinauer See 17 68219 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Kaul, Holger Hauptstr. 49A 74850 Schefflenz / DE | [2017/26] | Representative(s) | Marks, Frank ABB AG GF-IP Wallstadter Strasse 59 68526 Ladenburg / DE | [2017/26] | Application number, filing date | 16204048.9 | 14.12.2016 | [2017/26] | Priority number, date | EP20150003647 | 22.12.2015 Original published format: EP 15003647 | [2017/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3185272 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01H47/22, H01H47/36, H02H1/06 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
H01H47/226 (EP);
H01H47/36 (EP);
H01H71/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INSTALLATIONSGERÄT MIT EINER ANORDNUNG ZUR ANSTEUERUNG EINES BISTABILEN RELAIS | [2017/26] | English: | INSTALLATION DEVICE WITH AN ARRANGEMENT FOR DRIVING A BI-STABLE RELAY | [2017/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INSTALLATION D'UN SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE D'UN RELAIS BISTABLE | [2017/26] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/26] | 05.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5373412 (DOUSSE GILLES [FR]) [Y] 1-14 * column 1, lines 6-17 * * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 14; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5959826 (BAURAND GILLES [FR], et al) [Y] 1-14 * column 1, lines 6-12, 22-25 * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 62; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE102012208122 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 32] , [0 33] , [0 35] , [0 40] - [0042]; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP2538429 (TAVRIDA ELECTRIC HOLDING AG [CH]) [Y] 11,12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 23] , [0 26] , [0 30]; figures 2, 3 * * paragraphs [0032] , [0 34] , [0 35]; figure 4 * | by applicant | US5657194 |