EP3182192 - HALF MIRROR, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME AND LIGHTING UNIT USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STANLEY ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP | [2017/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Yoshio STANLEY ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-9-13, Nakameguro, Meguro-ku Tokyo, 153-8636 / JP | 02 /
KUROKI, Kazushige STANLEY ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-9-13, Nakameguro, Meguro-ku Tokyo, 153-8636 / JP | [2017/25] | Representative(s) | Klang, Alexander H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/25] | Klang, Alexander H. Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16204283.2 | 15.12.2016 | [2017/25] | Priority number, date | JP20150247400 | 18.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015247400 | [2017/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3182192 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/14, C23C14/00, F21S8/10 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
G02B27/142 (EP,US);
G02B5/0808 (US);
C23C14/0036 (US);
C23C14/083 (US);
C23C14/205 (EP,US);
C23C14/3407 (US);
C23C14/5853 (EP,US);
F21S41/275 (EP,US);
F21S41/28 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] |
Former [2017/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBSPIEGEL, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND BELEUCHTUNGSEINHEIT DAMIT | [2017/25] | English: | HALF MIRROR, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME AND LIGHTING UNIT USING THE SAME | [2017/25] | French: | DEMI-MIROIR, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET UNITÉ D'ÉCLAIRAGE L'UTILISANT | [2017/25] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 30.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/49] | 29.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP0756131 (MAGNETI MARELLI SPA [IT]) [X] 1,5,7,11,15 * column 2, lines 6-39; figure 1 * [Y] 2-4,8-10,12-14 [I] 6; | [Y]US5672243 (HSIA LIANG-CHOO [TW], et al) [Y] 8-10 * column 4, lines 36-63 * * column 6, lines 7-18 *; | [Y]DE20021657U (ALANOD AL VEREDLUNG GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2-4,8-10,12-14 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 2 ** page 7, paragraphs 1-4 *; | [XI]JP2010128440 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * [I] 7-10 | by applicant | JP2003115206 | JP2007087629 | US2016027968 | US2016268770 |