EP3335878 - PRINTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATMA Champ Enterprise Corporation No. 65, Wuquan 7th Road Wugu District New Taipei City 24890 / TW | [2018/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Tung Chin 21F., No. 111, Quyun Rd., Banqiao Dist. 22065 New Taipei City / TW | [2018/25] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Chaillot 16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2018/25] | Application number, filing date | 16204687.4 | 16.12.2016 | [2018/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3335878 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3335878 | Date: | 10.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B41F15/08, B41F21/10, B41J3/00 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
B41F15/0804 (EP,US);
B41F21/104 (EP);
B41J11/00214 (EP,US);
B41J13/223 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] | Title | German: | DRUCKMASCHINE | [2018/25] | English: | PRINTING MACHINE | [2018/25] | French: | PRESSE D' IMPRESSION | [2018/25] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.05.2017 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 19.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2016 | AL | 10.02.2021 | AT | 10.02.2021 | CY | 10.02.2021 | CZ | 10.02.2021 | DK | 10.02.2021 | EE | 10.02.2021 | ES | 10.02.2021 | FI | 10.02.2021 | HR | 10.02.2021 | LT | 10.02.2021 | LV | 10.02.2021 | MC | 10.02.2021 | MK | 10.02.2021 | MT | 10.02.2021 | NL | 10.02.2021 | PL | 10.02.2021 | RO | 10.02.2021 | RS | 10.02.2021 | SE | 10.02.2021 | SI | 10.02.2021 | SK | 10.02.2021 | SM | 10.02.2021 | TR | 10.02.2021 | BG | 10.05.2021 | NO | 10.05.2021 | GR | 11.05.2021 | IS | 10.06.2021 | PT | 11.06.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 16.12.2016 | |
AL | 10.02.2021 | ||
AT | 10.02.2021 | ||
CY | 10.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2021 | ||
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
ES | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
MC | 10.02.2021 | ||
MK | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RO | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SE | 10.02.2021 | ||
SI | 10.02.2021 | ||
SK | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
TR | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 16.12.2016 | |
AL | 10.02.2021 | ||
AT | 10.02.2021 | ||
CY | 10.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2021 | ||
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
ES | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
MC | 10.02.2021 | ||
MK | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RO | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SE | 10.02.2021 | ||
SI | 10.02.2021 | ||
SK | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 16.12.2016 | |
AL | 10.02.2021 | ||
AT | 10.02.2021 | ||
CY | 10.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2021 | ||
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
ES | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
MC | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RO | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SE | 10.02.2021 | ||
SI | 10.02.2021 | ||
SK | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 16.12.2016 | |
AL | 10.02.2021 | ||
AT | 10.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2021 | ||
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
ES | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
MC | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RO | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SE | 10.02.2021 | ||
SI | 10.02.2021 | ||
SK | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 10.02.2021 | |
AT | 10.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2021 | ||
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
ES | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
MC | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RO | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SE | 10.02.2021 | ||
SI | 10.02.2021 | ||
SK | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 10.02.2021 | |
AT | 10.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2021 | ||
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
ES | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RO | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SE | 10.02.2021 | ||
SI | 10.02.2021 | ||
SK | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 10.02.2021 | |
AT | 10.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2021 | ||
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
ES | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RO | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SE | 10.02.2021 | ||
SI | 10.02.2021 | ||
SK | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 10.02.2021 | |
AT | 10.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2021 | ||
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
ES | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RO | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SE | 10.02.2021 | ||
SK | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 10.02.2021 | |
AT | 10.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2021 | ||
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
ES | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RO | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SE | 10.02.2021 | ||
SK | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 10.02.2021 | |
AT | 10.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.02.2021 | ||
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RO | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SE | 10.02.2021 | ||
SK | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 10.02.2021 | |
CZ | 10.02.2021 | ||
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RO | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SE | 10.02.2021 | ||
SK | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 10.02.2021 | |
CZ | 10.02.2021 | ||
DK | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SE | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 10.02.2021 | |
CZ | 10.02.2021 | ||
EE | 10.02.2021 | ||
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SE | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 10.02.2021 | |
FI | 10.02.2021 | ||
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SE | 10.02.2021 | ||
SM | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 10.02.2021 | |
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SE | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 10.06.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 10.02.2021 | |
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
PL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SE | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 10.02.2021 | |
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
NL | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
SE | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 10.02.2021 | |
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
LV | 10.02.2021 | ||
RS | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 10.02.2021 | |
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
BG | 10.05.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
GR | 11.05.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 10.02.2021 | |
HR | 10.02.2021 | ||
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 10.02.2021 | |
LT | 10.02.2021 | ||
NO | 10.05.2021 | ||
PT | 11.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0412318 (QUAST GERD [DE]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]DE4444189 (LEIPOLD XAVER F GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006051558 (BLASUBRAMANIAN KAMESWARAN [IN]) [A] 1-14 * figures 2,4,5 * * claim 1 * * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 1 *; | [A]EP2990203 (ATMA CHAMP ENT CORP [TW]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |