EP3187051 - APPARATUS FOR DIVIDING SAUSAGES INTO PORTIONS, WINDING AROUND A PLATE AND PROVIDED WITH A CUTTING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states System B 9, Impasse Saint-Roch 53000 Laval / FR | [2017/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEUCHER, Jeremy Le Moulin de Pochard 53960 Bonchamp-les-Laval / FR | [2017/27] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [2018/48] |
Former [2017/27] | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet B.P. 90333 Technopole Atalante 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 16205222.9 | 20.12.2016 | [2017/27] | Priority number, date | FR20150063449 | 29.12.2015 Original published format: FR 1563449 | [2017/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3187051 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3187051 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A22C11/10, B65B9/00 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
A22C11/104 (EP);
A22C11/108 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] |
Former [2017/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUM PORTIONIEREN VON WÜRSTEN, DAS SICH UM EINE PLATTE ROLLT UND MIT EINEM SCHNEIDEWERKZEUG AUSGESTATTET IST | [2017/27] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DIVIDING SAUSAGES INTO PORTIONS, WINDING AROUND A PLATE AND PROVIDED WITH A CUTTING TOOL | [2017/27] | French: | APPAREIL DE MISE EN PORTION DE SAUCISSES S'ENROULANT AUTOUR D'UNE PLATINE ET DOTE D'UN OUTIL DE COUPE | [2017/27] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/01] | 12.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2016 | AL | 28.11.2018 | AT | 28.11.2018 | CY | 28.11.2018 | CZ | 28.11.2018 | DK | 28.11.2018 | EE | 28.11.2018 | FI | 28.11.2018 | HR | 28.11.2018 | LT | 28.11.2018 | LV | 28.11.2018 | MC | 28.11.2018 | MK | 28.11.2018 | MT | 28.11.2018 | PL | 28.11.2018 | RO | 28.11.2018 | RS | 28.11.2018 | SE | 28.11.2018 | SI | 28.11.2018 | SK | 28.11.2018 | SM | 28.11.2018 | TR | 28.11.2018 | IE | 20.12.2018 | LU | 20.12.2018 | BG | 28.02.2019 | NO | 28.02.2019 | GR | 01.03.2019 | IS | 28.03.2019 | PT | 28.03.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
MT | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
MT | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 28.11.2018 | |
NO | 28.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0109801 (DEVRO INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0139333 (DEVRO INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 1 - line 3 * * page 1, line 30 - line 33 * * page 3, line 6 - line 18 * * page 5, line 2 - line 21 * * page 6, line 8 - line 10 * * page 8, line 23 - page 15, line 30 * * figures 1-10 *; | [A]EP0503720 (RIGHELE GIOVANNI [IT]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 11 - column 4, line 57 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO9423584 (DEVRO LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-10* abstract * |