EP3339250 - PURIFICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nordaq Water Filter Systems AB Sveavägen 166 113 46 Stockholm / SE | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pettersson, Lasse Polovägen 1 187 31 TÄBY / SE | 02 /
Witz, Stefan Lantmätarvägen 7 187 53 Täby / SE | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | Groth & Co. KB P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | [2018/26] | Application number, filing date | 16205278.1 | 20.12.2016 | [2018/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3339250 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/00, C02F1/28, B01D35/06, // C02F1/48, B01D24/00, C02F1/42 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
C02F1/003 (EP,US);
C02F1/48 (EP,US);
C02F1/283 (EP,US);
C02F1/288 (EP,US);
C02F1/42 (EP,US);
C02F1/46176 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/26] | English: | PURIFICATION DEVICE | [2018/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PURIFICATION | [2018/26] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 24.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/15] | 12.02.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.08.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/15] | Appeal following examination | 12.04.2019 | Appeal received No. T1778/19 | 27.05.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.08.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 13.10.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 08.08.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08294683 (OKUBO TAKAYASU) [X] 1,3,4,14,16 * figures 1,4 ** paragraph [0063] *; | [XI]JP2005334750 (ACB KK, et al) [X] 1-4,8-10,13-15 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0024] * [I] 5-7,11,12,16; | [XI]JP2006212578 (KURITAKKU KK) [X] 1-3,7-15 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0023] * [I] 4-6,16 |