EP3338761 - COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.07.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Representative(s) | Berg, Katja DSM Nutritional Products Ltd Patent Department Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | Berg, Katja DSM Nutritional Products Ltd Patent Department Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | Application number, filing date | 16205437.3 | 20.12.2016 | [2018/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3338761 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/49, A61K8/67, A61Q19/00, A61K8/06, A61K8/39, A61K8/86 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
A61K8/4946 (EP,KR);
A61K8/676 (EP,KR);
A61K8/062 (EP,KR);
A61K8/39 (EP,KR);
A61K8/675 (EP,KR);
A61K8/86 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2018/26] | English: | COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS | [2018/26] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COSMÉTIQUES | [2018/26] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2018/49] | 22.07.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015146088 ; | [A]US2004067890 (GUPTA SHYAM K [US]) [A] 1-15 * example 3 *; | [A]US2008044494 (ROBINSON LARRY R [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0068] ** paragraph [0274] - paragraph [0275] *; | [A]US2010105638 (DEN-BRAVEN KERSTIN [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001]; example -; claim 1 *; | [A]US2014121255 (FARBER ELLIOTT [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0080]; example -; claim 37 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2015, no. 68, Database accession no. 2015-59513M, XP002767838 & WO2015146088 A1 20151001 (KOSE CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |