EP3338937 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Appliances Aktiebolag S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EHNINGER, Christian Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH Factory and Development Bodelschwinghstr. 1 91541 Rothenburg ob der Tauber / DE | 02 /
WIESINGER, Richard Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH Factory and Development Bodelschwinghstr. 1 91541 Rothenburg ob der Tauber / DE | 03 /
BÖCKLER, Marco Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH Factory and Development Bodelschwinghstr. 1 91541 Rothenburg ob der Tauber / DE | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents 105 45 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 16205561.0 | 20.12.2016 | [2018/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3338937 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/03, B23K26/046, B23K26/08, B23K26/21, B23K26/082, B23K26/044 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
B23K26/032 (EP,US);
B23K26/21 (EP,US);
B23K13/01 (US);
B23K26/044 (EP,US);
B23K26/046 (EP,US);
B23K26/082 (EP,US);
B23K26/0869 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] |
Former [2018/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HAUSHALTSGERÄTS | [2018/26] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE | [2018/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN APPAREIL DOMESTIQUE | [2018/26] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 02.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE102004043076 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [Y] 12 * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] , [0011] , [0012] , [0014] , [0021] , [0048] , [0049] *[A] 1,4,8-11,13; | [XY]DE102007008772 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 6]; figures 3a, 3b; claims 1,10 * [Y] 3-7; | [XY]CN103358023 (JIANGSU HEHAO LASER TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1,2,8-11,13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0010] - [0012] - [0032]; figures 1,3; claim 1 * [Y] 3-7,12,14; | [XY]EP2840321 (ELECTROLUX APPLIANCES AB [SE]) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0010] , [0031]; claims 1,2 * [Y] 14 | by applicant | EP2436986 | EP1640101 |