EP3340212 - READER DEVICE FOR READING A COMPOSITE MARKING COMPRISING A PHYSICAL UNCLONABLE FUNCTION FOR ANTI-COUNTERFEITING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/26] | PUF BASED COMPOSITE SECURITY MARKING FOR ANTI-COUNTERFEITING | ||
[2019/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Endress, Thomas Hesseloherstrasse 15 80802 München / DE | 02 /
Szabo, Daniel Friedrich Ebert Platz 16 64289 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
Wahl, Fabian Grosse Grof 8 9470 Buchs / CH | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | Platzöder, Michael Christian Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [2018/26] | Application number, filing date | 16205920.8 | 21.12.2016 | [2018/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3340212 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3340212 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G09C1/00, H04L9/32 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
G09C1/00 (EP,IL,RU,US);
G06K7/1417 (IL,US);
G06K7/1434 (KR);
G06K19/06046 (KR);
G06V30/32 (KR);
G09C5/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] |
Former [2018/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LESERVORRICHTUNG ZUM LESEN EINER KOMPOSIT-MARKIERUNG MIT EINER PHYSIKALISCHEN UNKLONBAREN FUNKTION ZUR FÄLSCHUNGSBEKÄMPFUNG | [2019/42] | English: | READER DEVICE FOR READING A COMPOSITE MARKING COMPRISING A PHYSICAL UNCLONABLE FUNCTION FOR ANTI-COUNTERFEITING | [2019/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE PERMETTANT DE LIRE UNE MARQUE COMPOSITE COMPRENANT UNE FONCTION PHYSIQUE INCLONABLE POUR L'ANTICONTREFACON | [2019/42] |
Former [2018/26] | LESERVORRICHTUNG ZUM LESEN EINER MARKIERUNG MIT EINER PHYSIKALISCHEN UNKLONBAREN FUNKTION | ||
Former [2018/26] | PUF BASED COMPOSITE SECURITY MARKING FOR ANTI-COUNTERFEITING | ||
Former [2018/26] | DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE PERMETTANT DE LIRE UNE MARQUE COMPRENANT UNE FONCTION PHYSIQUE NON CLONABLE | Examination procedure | 27.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 27.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19208613.0 / EP3640923 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2016 | AL | 13.11.2019 | AT | 13.11.2019 | CY | 13.11.2019 | CZ | 13.11.2019 | HR | 13.11.2019 | LT | 13.11.2019 | LV | 13.11.2019 | MC | 13.11.2019 | MK | 13.11.2019 | MT | 13.11.2019 | PL | 13.11.2019 | RO | 13.11.2019 | RS | 13.11.2019 | SI | 13.11.2019 | SK | 13.11.2019 | SM | 13.11.2019 | TR | 13.11.2019 | LU | 21.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | BG | 13.02.2020 | GR | 14.02.2020 | PT | 13.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 21.12.2016 | |
AL | 13.11.2019 | ||
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CY | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
MT | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
TR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LU | 21.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 21.12.2016 | |
AL | 13.11.2019 | ||
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CY | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
MT | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
LU | 21.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 21.12.2016 | |
AL | 13.11.2019 | ||
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CY | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
LU | 21.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CY | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
LU | 21.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
LU | 21.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
LU | 21.12.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | HR | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | LT | 13.11.2019 | |
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | LT | 13.11.2019 | |
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007031908 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,6-22 * figures 1,5,6 * * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line l * * page 10, line 14 - page 16, line l *; | [A]US2013127959 (HANINA ADAM [US]) [A] 1-22 * figures 3-8 * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0095] *; | [A]US2015183257 (GLENDENNING PAUL [DE], et al) [A] 1-22 * figures 4-8 * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0075] *; | [Y]EP2911335 (EUROPEAN UNION REPRESENTED BY THE EUROPEAN COMMISS [BE]) [Y] 3-5 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0047] *; | [XAY]EP2999156 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,6-15,19-22 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0048] * * figures 2-7 * [A] 16-18 [Y] 3-5; | [A] - PAWAN KUMAR ET AL, "Future prospects of luminescent nanomaterial based security inks: from synthesis to anti-counterfeiting applications", NANOSCALE, United Kingdom, (20160101), vol. 8, no. 30, doi:10.1039/C5NR06965C, ISSN 2040-3364, pages 14297 - 14340, XP055382820 [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5NR06965C | [A] - O. IVANOVA ET AL, "Unclonable security features for additive manufacturing", ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING, (20141001), vol. 1-4, doi:10.1016/j.addma.2014.07.001, ISSN 2214-8604, pages 24 - 31, XP055382782 [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0002] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addma.2014.07.001 | [A] - WONG CHAU-WAI ET AL, "Counterfeit detection using paper PUF and mobile cameras", 2015 IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON INFORMATION FORENSICS AND SECURITY (WIFS), IEEE, (20151116), doi:10.1109/WIFS.2015.7368579, pages 1 - 6, XP032840451 [A] 1-22 * paragraph [00II] - paragraph [0III] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WIFS.2015.7368579 | [A] - MIAO WANG ET AL, "Nanomaterial-based barcode", vol. 7, doi:10.1039/C5NR01948F, (20160525), pages 11240 - 11247, NANOSCALE,, URL: http://pubs.rsc.org/en/content/articlepdf/2015/NR/C5NR01948F, XP002765475 [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0007] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c5nr01948f | [A] - BORA YOON ET AL, "Recent functional material based approaches to prevent and detect counterfeiting", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY C, (20130121), vol. 1, no. 13, doi:10.1039/c3tc00818e, ISSN 2050-7526, pages 2388 - 2403, XP055148122 [A] 1-22 * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3tc00818e | [A] - DANIELA PAUNESCU ET AL, "Particles with an identity: Tracking and tracing in commodity products", POWDER TECHNOLOGY, CH, (20151229), vol. 291, doi:10.1016/j.powtec.2015.12.035, ISSN 0032-5910, pages 344 - 350, XP055250454 [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.powtec.2015.12.035 | [A] - FEI JIE ET AL, "Drug-laden 3D biodegradable label using QR code for anti-counterfeiting of drugs", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING C, ELSEVIER SCIENCE S.A, CH, (20160304), vol. 63, doi:10.1016/J.MSEC.2016.03.004, ISSN 0928-4931, pages 657 - 662, XP029489638 [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0002] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.msec.2016.03.004 | [A] - F. FAYAZPOUR ET AL, "Digitally Encoded Drug Tablets to Combat Counterfeiting", ADVANCED MATERIALS, DE, (20071119), vol. 19, no. 22, doi:10.1002/adma.200602800, ISSN 0935-9648, pages 3854 - 3858, XP055382756 [A] 1-22 * page 1 - page 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.200602800 | [A] - GOOCH JAMES ET AL, "Taggant materials in forensic science: A review", TRAC TRENDS IN ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20160811), vol. 83, doi:10.1016/J.TRAC.2016.08.003, ISSN 0165-9936, pages 49 - 54, XP029729461 [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [02.1] , [02.2] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.trac.2016.08.003 | [A] - NERALAGATTA M. SANGEETHA ET AL, "3D assembly of upconverting NaYF4 nanocrystals by AFM nanoxerography: creation of anti-counterfeiting microtags", NANOSCALE, United Kingdom, (20130101), vol. 5, no. 20, doi:10.1039/c3nr02734a, ISSN 2040-3364, page 9587, XP055382762 [A] 1-22 * page 9589 - page 9590 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3nr02734a | [A] - CHEUN NGEN CHONG ET AL, "Anti-counterfeiting with a Random Pattern", EMERGING SECURITY INFORMATION, SYSTEMS AND TECHNOLOGIES, 2008. SECURWARE '08. SECOND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080825), ISBN 978-0-7695-3329-2, pages 146 - 153, XP031319483 [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * | [A] - Dr Fred Jordan ET AL, "May/June 2012 PHARMACEUTICAL ENGINEERING anti-Counterfeiting Technologies Identifying Counterfeit Medicines with Industry-Suitable Technologies", (20120630), URL: http://www.alpvision.com/pdf/2012_05_PE_Identifying_Counterfeit_Medicines_with_Industry-Suitable_Technologies.pdf, (20140822), XP055136117 [A] 1-22 * page 3 - page 5 * | [A] - H Lou ET AL, "The familiar concept of the barcode for tracking may be coming to a chemical reaction near you in the form of coded microparticles", (20041001), URL: http://pubs.acs.org/doi/pdf/10.1021/ac0416463, (20170619), XP055382757 [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * | [A] - PETER ZIJLSTRA ET AL, "Five-dimensional optical recording mediated by surface plasmons in gold nanorods", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD., ETC.|, (20090521), vol. 459, doi:10.1038/NATURE08053, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 410 - 413, XP007912739 [A] 1-22 * page 1 - page 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature08053 | [A] - JISEOK LEE ET AL, "Universal process-inert encoding architecture for polymer microparticles", NATURE MATERIALS, GB, (20140413), vol. 13, no. 5, doi:10.1038/nmat3938, ISSN 1476-1122, pages 524 - 529, XP055382621 [A] 1-22 * page 524 - page 528 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmat3938 | [A] - YUHAI ZHANG ET AL, "Multicolor Barcoding in a Single Upconversion Crystal", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20140402), vol. 136, no. 13, doi:10.1021/ja5013646, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 4893 - 4896, XP055382626 [A] 1-22 * page 1 - page 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja5013646 | [A] - JANGBAE KIM ET AL, "Anti-counterfeit nanoscale fingerprints based on randomly distributed nanowires", NANOTECHNOLOGY, IOP, BRISTOL, GB, vol. 25, no. 15, doi:10.1088/0957-4484/25/15/155303, ISSN 0957-4484, (20140320), page 155303, (20140320), XP020261704 [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0002] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-4484/25/15/155303 | [A] - JULIEN ANDRES ET AL, "A New Anti-Counterfeiting Feature Relying on Invisible Luminescent Full Color Images Printed with Lanthanide-Based Inks", ADVANCED FUNCTIONAL MATERIALS, WILEY - V C H VERLAG GMBH & CO. KGAA, DE, vol. 24, no. 32, doi:10.1002/ADFM.201400298, ISSN 1616-301X, (20140827), pages 5029 - 5036, (20140522), XP001591486 [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0002] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adfm.201400298 | [A] - RADZIWON MICHAL ET AL, "Anti-counterfeit Solution from Organic Semiconductor", PROCEDIA ENGINEERING, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20140325), vol. 69, doi:10.1016/J.PROENG.2014.03.135, ISSN 1877-7058, pages 1405 - 1409, XP028832760 [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0003] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.proeng.2014.03.135 | Examination | US2008112596 | - Anonymous, "Introduction to Public-Key Cryptography", (19980910), URL: https://docs.oracle.com/cd/E19957-01/816-6154-10/, (20190228), XP055563475 | - OSAMU MATOBA ET AL, "Optical authentication method using a three-dimensional phase object with various wavelength readouts", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (20080820), vol. 47, no. 24, doi:10.1364/AO.47.004400, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 4400 - 4404, XP001515372 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.47.004400 |