EP3339980 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PATTERN ON A TIMEPIECE AND TIMEPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Swatch Group Research and Development Ltd Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grossenbacher, Pascal Rue du Crêt-Taconnet 12b 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 02 /
Allimann, Joël Clos de Bonané 4 1565 Vallon / CH | 03 /
Froellicher, Thomas Ch. des Roches 24 2525 Le Landeron / CH | 04 /
Golfier, Clare Chemin des Plantes 25e 2520 La Neuveville / CH | 05 /
Manasterski, Christian Rue du Lac 44 2525 Le Landeron / CH | 06 /
Salihu, Fatmir Jolimont 8 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 07 /
Spassov, Vladislav Route principale n°122 1788 Praz / CH | 08 /
Haemmerli, Alexandre Rue du Temple 6 2072 St-Blaise / CH | 09 /
Laforge, Elias Rue des Champréveyres 41 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2018/26] | Application number, filing date | 16206046.1 | 22.12.2016 | [2018/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3339980 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G04B45/00, G04B19/12, G04B37/22 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
C04B41/52 (EP);
C25D5/022 (EP,CH);
C04B41/90 (CH);
C23C28/00 (EP);
C25D7/005 (EP);
G04B19/12 (EP);
G04B37/22 (EP,CH);
G04B37/225 (EP);
G04B45/0076 (EP,CH);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/52, C04B41/4529, C04B41/4572, C04B41/5133 (EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4564, C04B41/4572, C04B41/51 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES DEKORMOTIVS AUF EINER UHR, UND ENTSPRECHENDE UHR | [2018/26] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PATTERN ON A TIMEPIECE AND TIMEPIECE | [2018/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION D'UN MOTIF SUR UNE PIÈCE HORLOGÈRE ET PIÈCE HORLOGÈRE | [2018/26] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/26] | 06.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP1548524 (ROLEX SA [CH]) [AD] 1,3-6,10 * paragraphs [0015] , [0017] , [0018] , [0020]; claims 1,9,10 *; | [AD]EP2380864 (OMEGA SA [CH]) [AD] 6,7,10* paragraphs [0006] , [0010] , [0027]; claim 1 *; | [A]EP2549340 (SWATCH GROUP RES & DEV LTD [CH]) [A] 6,7 * paragraph [0009]; claim 2 *; | [I]EP3035129 (SWATCH GROUP RES & DEV LTD [CH]) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0011] , [0018] , [0019] , [0021] - [0025] - [0029] , [0034]; figures 1-3; claim 10 *; | [A]EP3035125 (ROLEX SA [CH]) [A] 3,11 * columns 15,17 * |