Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023012604 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313846436 | 18.03.2013 | US202217949930 | 21.09.2022 | US201615191194 | 23.06.2016 | US201715674414 | 10.08.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9750920 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2017 | B2 | US2016317783 | 03.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313846436 | 18.03.2013 | US201615191194 | 23.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11478610 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2022 | B2 | US2017333676 | 23.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313846436 | 18.03.2013 | US201615191194 | 23.06.2016 | US201715674414 | 10.08.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6404898B | Global Dossier | 17.10.2018 | B2 | JP2016514513 | 23.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313846436 | 18.03.2013 | WO2014US23509 | 11.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3444005 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2020 | B1 | EP3444005 | 20.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313846436 | 18.03.2013 | EP16206169 | 11.03.2014 | WO2014US23509 | 11.03.2014 | EP14712181 | 11.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2976127 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2017 | B1 | EP2976127 | 27.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313846436 | 18.03.2013 | WO2014US23509 | 11.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105228689B | Global Dossier | 06.11.2018 | B | CN105228689 | 06.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313846436 | 18.03.2013 | WO2014US23509 | 11.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2906410 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2020 | C | CA2906410 | 25.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313846436 | 18.03.2013 | WO2014US23509 | 11.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018220016B | Global Dossier | 02.05.2019 | B2 | AU2018220016 | 06.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313846436 | 18.03.2013 | AU2018220016 | 21.08.2018 | AU2014237075 | 11.03.2014 | WO2014US23509 | 11.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014237075B | Global Dossier | 24.05.2018 | B2 | AU2014237075 | 08.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313846436 | 18.03.2013 | WO2014US23509 | 11.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3170529 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2018 | B1 | EP3170529 | 24.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313846436 | 18.03.2013 | WO2014US23509 | 11.03.2014 | EP14712181 | 11.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015024117 | 23.11.2021 | B1 | BR112015024117 | 18.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313846436 | 18.03.2013 | WO2014US23509 | 11.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2621330T | 03.07.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201313846436 | 18.03.2013 | WO2014US23509 | 11.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX369266 | 04.11.2019 | B | MX2015013130 | 08.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313846436 | 18.03.2013 | WO2014US23509 | 11.03.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014150530 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313846436 | 18.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9381320 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2016 | B2 | US2014276462 | 18.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313846436 | 18.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2706975T | 02.04.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201313846436 | 18.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2790853T | 29.10.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201313846436 | 18.03.2013 | Type | Divisional application | EP3444005 | Type | Earlier application | EP2976127 |