EP3339631 - WIND ENERGY PLANT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Skywind GmbH Johannes-Mejer-Strasse 8 25813 Husum / DE | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richert, Frank c/o SkyWind GmbH Johannes-Mejer-Strasse 8 25813 Husum / DE | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 16206284.8 | 22.12.2016 | [2018/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3339631 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/02, F03D13/20 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
F03D1/02 (EP);
F03D13/10 (EP);
F03D13/20 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP);
Y02E10/728 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WINDENERGIEANLAGENSYSTEM | [2018/26] | English: | WIND ENERGY PLANT SYSTEM | [2018/26] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉOLIENNES | [2018/26] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/26] | 12.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2402109 (OCEAN SYNERGY LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE672606 (HANS SCHELLER DIPL ING) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE102012102876 | DE102011015303 | WO2012115512 | DE102009010905 | EP0761964 |