Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9422478 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2016 | B2 | US2013327629 | 12.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011US43295 | 08.07.2011 | US201113810405 | 08.07.2011 | US83737610 | 15.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2593530 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2017 | B1 | EP2593530 | 06.01.2016 | A4 | EP2593530 | 22.05.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2011US43295 | 08.07.2011 | US83737610 | 15.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106010672B | Global Dossier | 02.08.2019 | B | CN106010672 | 12.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US83737610 | 15.07.2010 | CN201180040309 | 08.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103380196B | Global Dossier | 08.06.2016 | B | CN103380196 | 30.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011US43295 | 08.07.2011 | US83737610 | 15.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2805386 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2017 | C | CA2805386 | 19.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011US43295 | 08.07.2011 | US83737610 | 15.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015271933B | Global Dossier | 15.03.2018 | B2 | AU2015271933 | 21.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2011279499 | 08.07.2011 | WO2011US43295 | 08.07.2011 | US83737610 | 15.07.2010 | AU2015271933 | 18.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011279499B | Global Dossier | 01.10.2015 | B2 | AU2011279499 | 31.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011US43295 | 08.07.2011 | US83737610 | 15.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3211060 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2019 | B1 | EP3211060 | 30.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011US43295 | 08.07.2011 | US83737610 | 15.07.2010 | EP11807305 | 08.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2593530T | 27.03.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2011US43295 | 08.07.2011 | US83737610 | 15.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3211060T | 20.05.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US83737610 | 15.07.2010 | EP11807305 | 08.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX336403 | 18.01.2016 | B | MX2013000580 | 05.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011US43295 | 08.07.2011 | US83737610 | 15.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ605739 | 24.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011US43295 | 08.07.2011 | US83737610 | 15.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ700361 | 31.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ60573911 | 08.07.2011 | US83737610 | 15.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ715689 | 31.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ70036111 | 08.07.2011 | US83737610 | 15.07.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012009207 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2012 | A3 | WO2012009207 | 19.01.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US83737610 | 15.07.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8499702 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2013 | B2 | US2012012039 | 19.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83737610 | 15.07.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR082214 | 21.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83737610 | 15.07.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY164967 | 28.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US83737610 | 15.07.2010 | Type | Earlier application | EP2593530 |