27.04.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
19.04.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
19.04.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.04.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.04.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.03.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
15.03.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
15.12.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.01.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.10.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.09.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.05.2020 |
First examination report |
|
24.04.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.11.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.09.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.07.2018 |
Change - designated states |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
02.07.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
12.01.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
15.12.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] |
01.12.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
01.12.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
01.12.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
03.01.2017 |
Change - representative |
|