EP3264870 - OPTICAL MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hisense Broadband Multimedia Technologies Co., Ltd. No. 218 Qianwangang Road Economic and Technical Development Zone Qingdao Shandong 266555 / CN | For all designated states Hisense Broadband Multimedia Technologies, Ltd. 56 Administration Drive Wickhams Cay 1 Road Town, Tortola / VG | [2018/07] |
Former [2018/03] | For all designated states Hisense Broadband Multimedia Technologies, Ltd. Administration Drive 56 Wickhams Cay 1 Road Town, Tortola / VG | ||
For all designated states Hisense Broadband Multimedia Technologies Co., Ltd. No. 218 Qianwangang Road Economic and Technical Development Zone Qingdao Shandong 266555 / CN | |||
Former [2018/01] | For all designated states Hisense Broadband Multimedia Technologies Co., Ltd. No. 218 Qianwangang Road Economic and Technical Development Zone Qingdao Shandong 266555 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Peng c/o Hisense International Co., Ltd. No. 218, Qianwangang Road Economic and Technical Development Zone Qingdao, Shandong 266555 / CN | 02 /
XU, Haiqiang c/o Hisense International Co., Ltd. No. 218, Qianwangang Road Economic and Technical Development Zone Qingdao, Shandong 266555 / CN | 03 /
YANG, Sigeng c/o Hisense International Co., Ltd. No. 218, Qianwangang Road Economic and Technical Development Zone Qingdao, Shandong 266555 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Shuai c/o Hisense International Co., Ltd. No. 218, Qianwangang Road Economic and Technical Development Zone Qingdao, Shandong 266555 / CN | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/01] | Application number, filing date | 16206961.1 | 27.12.2016 | [2018/01] | Priority number, date | CN201610496308 | 28.06.2016 Original published format: CN201610496308 | [2018/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3264870 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3264870 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/14, H05K1/18, G02B6/42, F21V5/04, // H05K1/02, H05K3/00 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
F21V5/04 (EP,US);
H01L23/367 (CN);
F21V23/005 (US);
F21V29/503 (US);
F21V29/70 (US);
G02B6/4281 (EP,US);
H01L23/3675 (CN);
H05K1/147 (EP,US);
H05K1/18 (CN);
H05K1/189 (EP,US);
F21V15/01 (US);
G02B6/4269 (EP,US);
G02B6/4272 (EP,US);
H05K1/0203 (EP,US);
H05K1/0274 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/01] | H05K1/14, H05K1/18, G02B6/42, // H05K1/02, H05K3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] |
Former [2018/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OPTISCHES MODUL | [2018/01] | English: | OPTICAL MODULE | [2018/01] | French: | MODULE OPTIQUE | [2018/01] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2016 | Examination requested [2018/01] | 27.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4858071 (MANABE TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 13; figures 1, 2 ** column 4, line 24 - column 5, line 40; figures 4-6 *; | [XI]US6692159 (CHIU LIEW C [SG], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 41; figures 2, 3 * * column 7, lines 23-27 * * column 8, lines 10-15 * * column 9, lines 23-39 * * column 10, lines 37-46; figure 4A * * column 11, line 14 - column 12, line 28; figure 6F * [I] 2,11,12; | [XI]US7637672 (LI WEN [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 42 - column 6, line 10; figures 5A-5C * [I] 9,10; | [Y]US2010091501 (TAN ZEU-CHIA [TW], et al) [Y] 5,13,15 * paragraph [0035]; figure 3C *; | [XYI]US8396370 (MU JING HUI [US]) [X] 1,4,6,8,10,14 * column 1, lines 9-13 * * column 4, line 48 - column 6, line 20; figure 2 * * column 8, line 54 - column 10, line 8; figure 5 * [Y] 5,13,15 [I] 2,7,9,11,12 |