EP3202787 - HUMAN ANTIGEN BINDING PROTEINS THAT BIND BETA-KLOTHO, FGF RECEPTORS AND COMPLEXES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, California 91320-1799 / US | [2019/31] |
Former [2017/32] | For all designated states Amgen, Inc One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Shaw-Fen Sylvia 986 Lynnmere Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | 02 /
FOLTZ, Ian 2108 Knightswood Place Burnaby, BC V5A 4B9 / CA | 03 /
KING, Chadwick T. 1325 Moody Avenue North Vancouver, BC V7L 3T5 / CA | 04 /
LI, Yang 1142 Cuesta Drive Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 05 /
ARORA, Taruna 291 Whiteclem Way Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/24] | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2017/32] | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16207166.6 | 03.12.2010 | [2017/32] | Priority number, date | US20090267321P | 07.12.2009 Original published format: US 267321 P | US20100381846P | 10.09.2010 Original published format: US 381846 P | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3202787 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3202787 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/18, C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61P3/04, C07K19/00, C07K14/71 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
C07K16/2863 (EP,IL,US);
C07K16/28 (KR,US);
A61K38/17 (KR);
A61K38/18 (KR);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K47/42 (KR);
A61K48/00 (KR);
A61K49/16 (KR);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07K14/435 (KR);
C07K14/475 (KR);
C07K14/71 (EP,IL,US);
C07K16/18 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/22 (KR);
C07K16/40 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/24 (US);
C07K2317/32 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/34 (US);
C07K2317/53 (US);
C07K2317/54 (US);
C07K2317/55 (US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/622 (US);
C07K2317/626 (US);
C07K2317/75 (EP,IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Title | German: | MENSCHLICHES ANTIGEN BINDENDE PROTEINE ZUR BINDUNG VON BETA-KLOTHO, FGF-REZEPTOREN UND KOMPLEXE DARAUS | [2017/32] | English: | HUMAN ANTIGEN BINDING PROTEINS THAT BIND BETA-KLOTHO, FGF RECEPTORS AND COMPLEXES THEREOF | [2017/32] | French: | PROTÉINES DE LIAISON À ANTIGÈNE HUMAIN QUI SE LIENT À BÊTA-KLOTHO, AUX RÉCEPTEURS DE FGF ET AUX COMPLEXES DE CEUX-CI | [2017/32] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 28.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10788204.5 / EP2510009 | Divisional application(s) | EP20178046.7 / EP3760642 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.12.2010 | AL | 10.06.2020 | AT | 10.06.2020 | CY | 10.06.2020 | CZ | 10.06.2020 | DK | 10.06.2020 | EE | 10.06.2020 | ES | 10.06.2020 | FI | 10.06.2020 | HR | 10.06.2020 | IT | 10.06.2020 | LT | 10.06.2020 | LV | 10.06.2020 | MC | 10.06.2020 | MK | 10.06.2020 | MT | 10.06.2020 | NL | 10.06.2020 | PL | 10.06.2020 | RO | 10.06.2020 | RS | 10.06.2020 | SE | 10.06.2020 | SI | 10.06.2020 | SK | 10.06.2020 | SM | 10.06.2020 | TR | 10.06.2020 | BG | 10.09.2020 | NO | 10.09.2020 | GR | 11.09.2020 | IS | 10.10.2020 | PT | 12.10.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 03.12.2010 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
MT | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
TR | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
DK | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
PL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
ES | 10.06.2020 | ||
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
IT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
FI | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
NL | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
SE | 10.06.2020 | ||
NO | 10.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 10.06.2020 | |
NO | 10.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005037235 (IMCLONE SYSTEMS INC [US], et al); | [A]US2007293430 (FRYE CHRISTOPHER C [US], et al); | [IA]WO2008123625 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN [JP], et al); | [IPA]US2010184665 (SUZUKI MASASHI [JP], et al); | by applicant | US3773919 | EP0036676 | EP0058481 | US4399216 | EP0088046 | EP0133988 | EP0143949 | WO8705330 | US4740461 | US4751180 | US4816567 | US4912040 | WO9004036 | EP0367566 | US4935233 | US4946778 | US4959455 | US4965195 | US4968607 | US5011912 | WO9110741 | EP0460846 | WO9203918 | WO9215673 | WO9222646 | WO9301227 | WO9310151 | EP0546073 | US5262522 | WO9402602 | US5292658 | WO9410308 | WO9507463 | US5418155 | US5426048 | US5457035 | US5530101 | US5545807 | US5545806 | US5569825 | WO9633735 | US5585089 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5661016 | EP0546073 | US5683888 | US5693762 | US5693761 | WO9814605 | US5741668 | WO9824893 | WO9826277 | US5770429 | US5777079 | US5789650 | US5804387 | US5814318 | US5874299 | US5874304 | US5877293 | US5877397 | US5876995 | WO9910494 | US5886152 | US5925558 | WO9949019 | WO0009560 | US6054297 | US6162963 | WO0076310 | US6180370 | US6255458 | US6270964 | US6300129 | US2003039958 | US6673986 | US2004009507 | US6696245 | US2004038291 | US6713610 | US2004202995 | US6846634 | US2005202512 | WO1993US00829 | WO1994US01875 | US19960759620 |