EP3189790 - SURGICAL INSTRUMENTS WITH SEPARABLE MOTORS AND MOTOR CONTROL CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC 475 Street C Los Frailes Industrial Park 00969 Guaynabo / PR | [2017/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARRIS, Jason L. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US | 02 /
YATES, David C. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US | 03 /
SHELTON, IV, Frederick 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US | [2017/28] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/28] | Application number, filing date | 16207241.7 | 29.12.2016 | [2017/28] | Priority number, date | US201514984552 | 30.12.2015 Original published format: US201514984552 | [2017/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3189790 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072, // A61B17/00 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/072 (US);
A61B2017/00017 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00039 (US);
A61B2017/00075 (US);
A61B2017/00084 (US);
A61B2017/00123 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00137 (US);
A61B2017/00199 (US);
A61B2017/00314 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00473 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00734 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07257 (US);
A61B2017/07271 (US);
A61B2017/2903 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0808 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0809 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] |
Former [2017/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE INSTRUMENTE MIT TRENNBAREN MOTOREN UND MOTORSTEUERUNGSSCHALTUNGEN | [2017/28] | English: | SURGICAL INSTRUMENTS WITH SEPARABLE MOTORS AND MOTOR CONTROL CIRCUITS | [2017/28] | French: | INSTRUMENTS CHIRURGICAUX À MOTEURS SÉPARABLES ET CIRCUITS DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR | [2017/28] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 21.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 14.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2044890 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]); | [XI]EP2772206 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]); | [A]EP2792308 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]); | [A]EP2957234 (COVIDIEN LP [US]) | by applicant | US2013274722 | US2013282052 | US2014110453 | US2014305990 | US8968276 |