EP3342843 - UPGRADING KETOACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neste Oyj Keilaranta 21 02150 Espoo / FI | [2018/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIITTA, Marja c/o NESTE OYJ IPR P.O. Box 310 Technology Centre, Kilpilahti 06101 Porvoo / FI | 02 /
LINDBLAD, Marina c/o NESTE OYJ IPR P.O. Box 310 Technology Centre, Kilpilahti 06101 Porvoo / FI | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2018/27] | Application number, filing date | 16207465.2 | 30.12.2016 | [2018/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3342843 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3342843 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C10G45/58, C07C51/353, C07C51/367, C10G65/04, C10G3/00 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
C10G45/58 (EP);
C07D307/33 (US);
B01J29/041 (EP);
B01J29/70 (US);
B01J29/7007 (EP,US);
B01J29/80 (US);
C10G3/50 (EP);
C10G45/12 (US);
C10G65/043 (EP);
C10L1/04 (US);
B01J2029/062 (US);
C10G2300/1014 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG VON KETOSÄURE | [2018/27] | English: | UPGRADING KETOACID | [2018/27] | French: | VALORISATION DE CÉTOACIDE | [2018/27] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 27.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 20.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.12.2016 | AL | 25.11.2020 | AT | 25.11.2020 | CY | 25.11.2020 | CZ | 25.11.2020 | DK | 25.11.2020 | EE | 25.11.2020 | HR | 25.11.2020 | LT | 25.11.2020 | LV | 25.11.2020 | MC | 25.11.2020 | MK | 25.11.2020 | MT | 25.11.2020 | PL | 25.11.2020 | RO | 25.11.2020 | RS | 25.11.2020 | SI | 25.11.2020 | SK | 25.11.2020 | SM | 25.11.2020 | TR | 25.11.2020 | IE | 30.12.2020 | LU | 30.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | BG | 25.02.2021 | GR | 26.02.2021 | IS | 25.03.2021 | PT | 25.03.2021 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.12.2016 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
MT | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
TR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.12.2020 | ||
LU | 30.12.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | RS | 25.11.2020 | |
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | PT | 25.03.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006135793 (BLESSING ROBERT W [NL], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0002] , [0021] *; | [AD]WO2015144856 (NESTE OIL OYJ [FI]) [AD] 1-11 * page 1, line 5 - line 8 * * page 3, line 29 - line 31 * * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 7 *; | [A]US2016221914 (MYLLYOJA JUKKA [FI], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0014] , [0016] *; | [A]US2016221912 (MYLLYOJA JUKKA [FI], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0013] *; | [XA]US2016264876 (MASCAL MARK [US], et al) [X] 10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0014] , [0033] , [0059] , [0060] , [0062] , [0070] , [0071] * [A] 1-9,11; | [XI] - C.R. PATIL ET AL, "Esterification of levulinic acid to ethyl levulinate over bimodal micro-mesoporous H/BEA zeolite derivatives", CATALYSIS COMMUNICATIONS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20140101), vol. 43, doi:10.1016/j.catcom.2013.10.006, ISSN 1566-7367, pages 188 - 191, XP055377600 [X] 1-7,11 * pages 188,190; figure 4; table 1 * [I] 8,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.catcom.2013.10.006 | by applicant | US5198203 | WO2006070073 | WO2015144856 | - PEREGO, MICROPOROUS AND MESOPOROUS MATERIALS, (2011), vol. 144, pages 29 - 39 | - Advanced Zeolite Science and Applications, pages 329 - 331 |