Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3229452 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3229452



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 382
08.07.2020 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
17.04.2020 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.07.2019 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
21.06.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.06.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
07.06.2019 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
07.06.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.06.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 35
07.06.2019 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 35
14.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.05.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
14.05.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
14.05.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
14.05.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
14.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.05.2019 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
04.01.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.01.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.01.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.01.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 35
04.01.2019 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 35
16.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.07.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 28
16.07.2018 Description Search / examination 18
16.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.07.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.05.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
31.05.2018 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 2
31.05.2018 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
25.05.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
10.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.04.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
10.04.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
10.04.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
10.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.11.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
17.11.2017 Submission concerning change of applicant's address Search / examination 3
16.10.2017 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
04.10.2017 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 3
13.09.2017 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
23.08.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
11.08.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.08.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 4
11.08.2017 European search report Search / examination 2
11.08.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
07.08.2017 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
10.04.2017 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
30.03.2017 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
29.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.03.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
29.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
29.03.2017 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
22.02.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.02.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.01.2017 Invitation to file claims Search / examination 1
30.12.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.12.2016 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
30.12.2016 Description Search / examination 33
30.12.2016 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.12.2016 Drawings Search / examination 9
30.12.2016 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
26.10.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 48