EP3249312 - DUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2018 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | 05.07.2018 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROMAT SAS Rue de l'Amandier 78540 Vernouillet / FR | [2017/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Venkov, Vesselin Promat SAS 7 Rue Sainte Catherine 78630 Orgeval / FR | [2017/48] | Representative(s) | Vaeck, Elke, et al Etex Services NV Kuiermansstraat 1 1880 Kapelle-op-den-Bos / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/48] | Van Steenlandt, Wim August Maria, et al Etex Services NV Kuiermansstraat 1 1880 Kapelle-op-den-Bos / BE | Application number, filing date | 16290092.2 | 27.05.2016 | [2017/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3249312 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/02, F16L59/14, F16L9/00, F16L9/22 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
F24F13/0263 (EP);
F16L59/145 (EP);
F16L9/003 (EP);
F16L9/22 (EP);
F24F13/0254 (EP);
F24F2221/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEITUNGEN | [2017/48] | English: | DUCTS | [2017/48] | French: | CONDUITS | [2017/48] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2014191664 (CONCEPTS ET DEV EN PROT INCENDIE [FR]) [I] 1-15 * page 3, line 10 - page 6, line 2; figures 1,2; claims 1,2,3,5,10-13 *; | [A]DE2912674 (E T WAKOFIX MONTAGEBAU GMBH &) [A] 1,7 * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [A]DE202011052284U (KRENSEL GMBH BRANDSCHUTZTECHNISCHE BAUSYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2431584 (SAUSSEZ DANIEL [FR]) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph 1; figure 1 * |