EP3199942 - A DOWNHOLE FLUID PROPERTIES OPTICAL ANALYSIS PROBE HAVING A REMOVABLE OPTICAL TIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Openfield 13, rue de Limoges 78000 Versailles / FR | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONZIER, Eric 5 rue du Puits au Gall 28260 Berchères sur Vesgre / FR | 02 /
ABBASSI, Linda 2 Mail des Betulas 78180 Montigny le Bretonneux / FR | 03 /
TAVERNIER, Emmanuel 22 Av Philippe Auguste 75011 Paris / FR | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | Gabriel, Franck PROXIP 3, rue de l'Arrivée 75749 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | [2017/31] | Application number, filing date | 16305103.0 | 01.02.2016 | [2017/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3199942 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/85 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
G01V8/16 (EP,US);
E21B17/1078 (US);
E21B47/017 (EP,US);
E21B47/113 (EP,US);
E21B49/08 (US);
G01N21/474 (EP,US);
G01N21/645 (EP,US);
G01N21/8507 (EP,US);
G01N2021/4742 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6484 (EP,US);
G01N2021/8528 (EP,US);
G02B6/3624 (EP,US);
G02B6/4428 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE ANALYSESONDE MIT ABNEHMBARER OPTISCHER SPITZE FÜR BOHRLOCHFLÜSSIGKEITSEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2017/31] | English: | A DOWNHOLE FLUID PROPERTIES OPTICAL ANALYSIS PROBE HAVING A REMOVABLE OPTICAL TIP | [2017/31] | French: | SONDE D'ANALYSE OPTIQUE DES PROPRIÉTÉS D'UN FLUIDE DE FOND DE PUITS COMPORTANT UNE SONDE D'ANALYSE DOTÉE D'UNE POINTE OPTIQUE AMOVIBLE | [2017/31] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/32] | 13.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0450256 (HECTRONIC AG [CH]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US2002009252 (MARON ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [XDI]WO2015059380 (R B I [FR]) [XD] 1-8 * abstract * * page 6 - page 7 * [I] 9,10 | by applicant | WO2015059380 |