EP3207909 - SUPPORTING STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hexowheel 86 rue de Paris 91400 Orsay / FR | [2018/49] |
Former [2017/34] | For all designated states Linon, Rodolphe 87 rue du Chemin Vert 75011 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINON, Rodolphe 87 rue du Chemin Vert 75011 Paris / FR | [2018/49] |
Former [2017/34] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/34] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 16305189.9 | 18.02.2016 | [2017/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3207909 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3207909 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/14, A61G5/06, A61H3/00, A61H3/04, A61G5/12, A61G5/04, A61H1/02 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
A61G5/061 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61G5/14 (EP,IL,US);
A61G5/04 (US);
A61G5/068 (RU,US);
A61G5/122 (EP,IL,US);
A61G5/124 (EP,IL,US);
A61G5/127 (EP,IL,US);
A61G5/128 (EP,IL,US);
A61H1/024 (EP,US);
A61H1/0244 (EP,US);
A61H1/0266 (EP,US);
A61H3/00 (EP,RU,US);
A61H3/008 (IL);
A61H3/04 (EP,IL,US);
A61H2003/001 (EP,US);
A61H2003/007 (US);
A61H2003/043 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0161 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1207 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1623 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1633 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/34] | A61G5/14, A61G5/06, A61H3/00, A61H3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] |
Former [2017/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STÜTZSTRUKTUR | [2017/34] | English: | SUPPORTING STRUCTURE | [2017/34] | French: | STRUCTURE DE SUPPORT | [2017/34] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 26.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.02.2016 | AL | 11.09.2019 | CY | 11.09.2019 | CZ | 11.09.2019 | EE | 11.09.2019 | FI | 11.09.2019 | HR | 11.09.2019 | LT | 11.09.2019 | LV | 11.09.2019 | MK | 11.09.2019 | MT | 11.09.2019 | PL | 11.09.2019 | RO | 11.09.2019 | RS | 11.09.2019 | SI | 11.09.2019 | SK | 11.09.2019 | SM | 11.09.2019 | TR | 11.09.2019 | BG | 11.12.2019 | GR | 12.12.2019 | IS | 12.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 18.02.2016 | |
AL | 11.09.2019 | ||
CY | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MT | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
TR | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 11.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0713692 (PAAS DIETER DIPL ING FH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US6364040 (KLANN JOSEPH C [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2009044568 (UNIV TOKYO SCI EDUC FOUND [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]KR20130001663 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | - SAMI J YLÖNEN ET AL, "WorkPartner -centaur like service robot WorkPartner -Centaur like Service Robot", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2002 IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS, (20020101), doi:10.1109/IRDS.2002.1041477.Source:, pages 727 - 732, XP055570055 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IRDS.2002.1041477·Source: |