EP3169043 - SUPPORT OF IMEI CHECKING FOR WLAN ACCESS TO A PACKET CORE OF A MOBILE NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2017/20] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DREVON, Nicolas Alcatel-Lucent International Centre de Villarceaux Route de Villejust 91620 NOZAY / FR | 02 /
THIEBAUT, Laurent Alcatel-Lucent International Centre de Villarceaux Route de Villejust 91620 NOZAY / FR | 03 /
LANDAIS, Bruno Alcatel-Lucent International 4 rue Louis de Broglie 22304 LANNION / FR | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/20] | El Manouni, Josiane Alcatel-Lucent International 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Application number, filing date | 16305322.6 | 22.03.2016 | [2017/20] | Priority number, date | EP20150306791 | 11.11.2015 Original published format: EP 15306791 | [2017/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3169043 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/06, H04W8/08, H04W12/062, H04L9/40, // H04W84/12 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
H04L63/0876 (EP,US);
H04L63/0892 (US);
H04W12/062 (EP,US);
H04W8/08 (US);
H04W8/082 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/20] | H04L29/06, H04W12/06, // H04W84/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/52] |
Former [2017/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON IMEI-PRÜFUNG FÜR WLAN-ZUGRIFF AUF EINEN PAKETKERN EINES MOBILEN NETZWERKS | [2017/20] | English: | SUPPORT OF IMEI CHECKING FOR WLAN ACCESS TO A PACKET CORE OF A MOBILE NETWORK | [2017/20] | French: | SUPPORT DE VÉRIFICATION D'IMEI POUR UN ACCÈS WLAN À UN NOYAU DE PAQUETS D'UN RÉSEAU MOBILE | [2017/20] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2017 | Examination requested [2017/52] | 28.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.06.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 27.06.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.07.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.02.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 28.02.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.03.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014165149 (CHEN XUMING [US], et al); | [A]WO2014117811 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); |