EP3223063 - DEVICE FOR FORMING A FIELD INTENSITY PATTERN IN THE NEAR ZONE, FROM INCIDENT ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2017/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLONDE, Laurent c/o TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE 975 Avenue des Champs-Blancs CS17616 35576 CESSON SEVIGNE / FR | 02 /
BORISKIN, Artem c/o TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE 975 Avenue des Champs-Blancs CS17616 35576 CESSON SEVIGNE / FR | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/39] | Huchet, Anne, et al TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 16305343.2 | 24.03.2016 | [2017/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3223063 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/56, B82Y20/00 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
G02B27/56 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y20/00 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/1225 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] |
Former [2017/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BILDUNG VON EINEM FELDINTENSITÄTSMUSTER IM NAHBEREICH AUS EINFALLENDEN ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN WELLEN | [2017/39] | English: | DEVICE FOR FORMING A FIELD INTENSITY PATTERN IN THE NEAR ZONE, FROM INCIDENT ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVES | [2017/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION D'UN MOTIF D'INTENSITÉ DE CHAMP DANS LA ZONE PROCHE, À PARTIR DES ONDES ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUES INCIDENTES | [2017/39] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 21.03.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - Matsui Takayuki, "Transmission phase control by stacked metal-dielectric hole array with two-dimensional geometric design References and linksOptical properties of metallic films for vertical- cavity optoelectronic devices", Opt. Express, (20120702), pages 16092 - 16103, URL: https://www.osapublishing.org/DirectPDFAccess/361B515A-A050-AB91-CCA9AEE312AC2677_239457/oe-20-14-16092.pdf?da=1&id=239457&seq=0&mobile=no, (20160922), XP055304928 [X] 1-11 * page 16096, paragraph 3 - page 16097 * * figure 1b * * figure 2 * | [X] - VICTOR V KOTLYAR ET AL, "Photonic nanojets generated using square-profile microsteps", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC; US, vol. 53, no. 24, doi:10.1364/AO.53.005322, ISSN 0003-6935, (20140820), pages 5322 - 5329, (20140812), XP001591352 [X] 1,2,6,10 * page 5323; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.53.005322 | by applicant | US7394535 | US8003965 | US2013308127 | - A. HEIFETEZ, "Photonic nanojets", J. COMPUT. THEO. NANOSCI., (2009), vol. 6, pages 1979 - 1992 | - L. NOVOTNY ET AL., "Near-field optical microscopy and spectroscopy with pointed probes", ANNU. REV. PHYS. CHEM, (2006), vol. 57, pages 303 - 331 | - V. PACHECO-PENA, "Terajets produced by dielectric cuboids", APPLIED PHYS. LETT., (2014), vol. 105, page 084102 | - Y. GU ET AL., "Plasmonic structures color generation via subwavelength plasmonic nanostructures", J. NANOSCALE, (2015), vol. 7, doi:doi:10.1039/C5NR00578G, pages 6409 - 6419, XP055363682 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5NR00578G |