EP3247083 - SYSTEM OF FLEXIBLE SECURE IOT NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEMALTO SA 6 Rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2017/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROLH, Abraham 14 Allée de la pépinière 95150 Taverny / FR | 02 /
MALLET, Chrystèle 111, Avenue de la République 92120 Montrouge / FR | 03 /
BLOCHET, Marc 21Bis, rue du Maréchal Galliéni - Bât. B 78000 Versailles / FR | [2017/47] | Application number, filing date | 16305569.2 | 17.05.2016 | [2017/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3247083 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/24, H04L9/08, H04W12/04, H04W4/00 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
H04W12/04 (EP);
H04W4/70 (EP,US);
H04L41/0806 (EP);
H04L63/064 (EP);
H04L9/0819 (EP);
H04W12/35 (EP);
H04W4/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR FLEXIBLEN SICHERUNG VON IOT-NETZWERKEN | [2017/47] | English: | SYSTEM OF FLEXIBLE SECURE IOT NETWORKS | [2017/47] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉSEAUX IOT SÉCURISÉS FLEXIBLES | [2017/47] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/46] | 26.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008122906 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 25 * * page 5, line 8 - page 6, line 8 ** page 8, line 12 - page 9, line 29 *; | [A]US2013081113 (CHERIAN GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0028] * * paragraphs [0038] , [0 43] , [0 55] * * paragraphs [0059] - [0069] *; | [A] - HUMMEN RENE ET AL, "Delegation-based authentication and authorization for the IP-based Internet of Things", 2014 ELEVENTH ANNUAL IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SENSING, COMMUNICATION, AND NETWORKING (SECON), IEEE, (20140630), doi:10.1109/SAHCN.2014.6990364, pages 284 - 292, XP032708816 [A] 1-6 * abstract * * section I * * section II-A * * section IV * * section VII * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SAHCN.2014.6990364 | [A] - URIEN PASCAL, "Towards secure elements for the Internet of Things: The eLock use case: Work in progress - Invited paper", 2016 SECOND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MOBILE AND SECURE SERVICES (MOBISECSERV), IEEE, doi:10.1109/MOBISECSERV.2016.7440228, ISBN 978-1-4673-9684-4, (20160226), pages 1 - 5, (20160323), XP032886164 [A] 1-6 * abstract * * section I * * section II * * sections V-B, B-C * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MOBISECSERV.2016.7440228 |