EP3264763 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPROVED SIGNIFICANCE FLAG CODING USING SIMPLE LOCAL PREDICTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2018/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LASSERRE, Sebastien Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs ZAC des Champs Blancs CS 176 16 35576 Cesson Sévigné / FR | 02 /
ANDRIVON, Pierre Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs ZAC des Champs Blancs CS 176 16 35576 Cesson Sévigné / FR | 03 /
BORDES, Philippe Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs ZAC des Champs Blancs CS 176 16 35576 Cesson Sévigné / FR | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne, et al InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/01] | Huchet, Anne TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 16305799.5 | 29.06.2016 | [2018/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3264763 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/13, H04N19/18, H03M7/40 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
H04N19/13 (EP,KR);
H04N19/46 (US);
G06F17/18 (US);
H03M7/3073 (EP);
H03M7/3079 (EP);
H03M7/40 (EP);
H03M7/4018 (EP,KR);
H04N19/129 (KR,US);
H04N19/18 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR VERBESSERTE FLAGGENCODIERUNG MIT EINFACHEM LOKALEM PRÄDIKTOR | [2018/01] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPROVED SIGNIFICANCE FLAG CODING USING SIMPLE LOCAL PREDICTOR | [2018/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CODAGE DE DRAPEAU D'IMPORTANCE AMÉLIORÉ À L'AIDE DE PRÉDICTEUR LOCAL SIMPLE | [2018/01] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/52] | 09.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2013012819 (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-13* paragraphs [0037] , [0 46]; figures 10, 13; claim 1 *; | [X]WO2013158642 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0034] , [ 134] , [ 142] , [ 158] , [ 162] - [0164]; figure 6 *; | [X] - NGUYEN N ET AL, "Significant Coefficient Flag Context Models for Modular Processing", 8. JCT-VC MEETING; 99. MPEG MEETING; 1-2-2012 - 10-2-2012; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120120), no. JCTVC-H0411, XP030111438 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP20160305554 |