EP3301960 - AN ACCESS DELEGATION SYSTEM FOR AN OWNER USER TO DELEGATE TO A DELEGATE AN AUTHORIZATION FOR ACCESSING TO A RESOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEMALTO SA 6 Rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2018/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LESAS, Anne-Marie GEMALTO SA Intellectual property departmenent 6 rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | 02 /
LENGELLÉ, Denis GEMALTO SA Intellectual property department 6 rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2018/14] | Representative(s) | Cassagne, Philippe M.J., et al Thales Dis France SAS Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/14] | Delaval, Guillaume Laurent Gemalto SA Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92197 Meudon Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 16306282.1 | 30.09.2016 | [2018/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3301960 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/08, H04L29/06, // H04W4/00, G07C9/00 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
H04W12/08 (EP);
G07C9/00174 (EP);
G07C9/00571 (EP);
H04L63/108 (EP);
G07C2009/00769 (EP);
G07C2009/00865 (EP);
H04L63/0853 (EP);
H04W12/33 (EP);
H04W12/61 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUGANGSDELEGATIONSSYSTEM FÜR EINEN EIGENTÜMERBENUTZER ZUM DELEGIEREN EINER BERECHTIGUNG FÜR DEN ZUGRIFF AUF EINE RESSOURCE AN EINEN DELEGIERTEN | [2018/14] | English: | AN ACCESS DELEGATION SYSTEM FOR AN OWNER USER TO DELEGATE TO A DELEGATE AN AUTHORIZATION FOR ACCESSING TO A RESOURCE | [2018/14] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉLÉGATION D'ACCÈS POUR UN UTILISATEUR DE PROPRIÉTAIRE POUR DÉLÉGUER À UN DÉLÉGUÉ UNE AUTORISATION POUR ACCÉDER À UNE RESSOURCE | [2018/14] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/13] | 08.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010176919 (MYERS PETER CHRISTIAN [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0005] , [00 7] , [00 9] - [0013] - [0 26] , [0 35] , [0 37] , [0 40] , [0 41] , [0 45] , [0 52] , [0 57] , [0 63]; figures 1-2 * [I] 1-14; | [XI]US2010125894 (YASREBI MEHRAD [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0 35] , [0 37] , [0 39] , [0 41] - [0043] - [0 45] , [0 46] , [0 55]; figures 1-5 * [I] 1-14; | [A] - D Hardt, "RFC 6749 The OAuth 2.0 Authorization Framework", (20121031), pages 1 - 76, URL: https://www.rfc-editor.org/rfc/pdfrfc/rfc6749.txt.pdf, (20151006), XP055218558 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |