EP3305405 - MANGAN(III)-MANGAN(IV) MIXED OXIDE CATALYST CONTAINING AN INTERCALATED CATION X FOR AEROBIC OXIDATIVE CLEAVAGE OF 1,2-DIOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | For all designated states Yale University 2 Whitney Avenue New Haven, CT 06510 / US | For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE MONTPELLIER 163 rue Auguste Broussonnet 34090 Montpellier / FR | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESCANDE, Vincent 1 B rue Armand de Pontmartin 30133 LES ANGLES / FR | 02 /
GRISON, Claude 29, rue des Bastides 34170 CASTELNAU-LE-LEZ / FR | 03 /
ANASTAS, Paul 25 Den Hollow Road GUILFORD, CT Connecticut CT 06437 / US | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Bourgouin, André, et al Grosset-Fournier & Demachy 54, rue Saint Lazare 75009 Paris / FR | [2018/15] | Application number, filing date | 16306337.3 | 10.10.2016 | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3305405 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/889, B01J23/34, B01J23/656, B01J23/68, B01J37/03, B01J37/12, C07C45/51, C07C45/52, C07C45/38, C07C45/39, C07D213/48, C07D307/12, C07D213/30, C07D307/42, // B01J37/14, B01J35/00, B01J35/02 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
B01J23/8892 (EP);
B01J23/34 (EP);
B01J23/6562 (EP);
B01J23/688 (EP);
B01J37/031 (EP);
B01J37/12 (EP);
C07C45/298 (EP);
C07D213/30 (EP);
C07D213/48 (EP);
C07D307/12 (EP);
C07D307/42 (EP);
B01J2523/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/298, C07C47/06 (EP);
C07C45/298, C07C47/23 (EP);
C07C45/298, C07C47/232 (EP);
C07C45/298, C07C47/54 (EP);
C07C45/298, C07C47/55 (EP);
C07C45/298, C07C49/78 (EP);
C07C45/39, C07C47/06 (EP);
C07C45/39, C07C47/23 (EP);
C07C45/39, C07C47/232 (EP);
C07C45/39, C07C47/54 (EP);
C07C45/39, C07C47/55 (EP);
C07C45/39, C07C49/78 (EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/12, B01J2523/72 (EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/22, B01J2523/72 (EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/23, B01J2523/72 (EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/24, B01J2523/72 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MANGAN(III)-MANGAN(IV)-MISCHOXID-BASIERTER KATALYSATOR MIT INTERKALIERTEM KATION X ZUR AEROBEN OXIDATIVEN SPALTUNG VON 1,2-DIOLEN | [2018/15] | English: | MANGAN(III)-MANGAN(IV) MIXED OXIDE CATALYST CONTAINING AN INTERCALATED CATION X FOR AEROBIC OXIDATIVE CLEAVAGE OF 1,2-DIOLS | [2018/15] | French: | CATALYSEUR À BASE D'OXYDE DE MANGANÈSE (III) ET MANGANÈSE (IV) CONTENANT UN CATION INTERCALÉ X POUR LE CLIVAGE OXYDATIF AÉROBIE DE 1,2-DIOLS | [2018/15] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/15] | 22.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]CN103172119 (HUNAN RES INST CHEMICAL IND); |