EP3324655 - METHOD FOR MANAGING A PATCH OF A SOFWARE COMPONENT IN A EUICC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2018/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LABOURIE, Florent c/o GEMALTO SA Intellectual Property Department 525, Avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 Gemenos Cedex / FR | 02 /
YANTO, Rudy c/o GEMALTO SA Intellectual Property Department 525, Avenue du Pic de Bertagne CS12023 13881 Gemenos Cedex / FR | [2018/21] | Application number, filing date | 16306499.1 | 17.11.2016 | [2018/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3324655 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00, G06F21/77, H04W12/06, // H04L29/06, H04W8/18, G06F9/445 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
G06F21/77 (EP);
H04L67/34 (EP);
H04W12/06 (EP);
H04W12/35 (EP);
H04W4/50 (EP);
G06F8/65 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG EINES PATCH EINES SOFTWAREPAKETS IM EIN EUICC | [2018/21] | English: | METHOD FOR MANAGING A PATCH OF A SOFWARE COMPONENT IN A EUICC | [2018/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION D'UNE CORRECTION DE COMPOSANT LOGICIEL POUR UN EUICC | [2018/21] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/21] | 09.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2448216 (APPLE INC [US]) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0096] * * figures 2,2B,3 *; | [I]WO2013123233 (APPLE INC [US]) [I] 1-10 * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 32 * * page 8, line 9 - page 13, line 25 * * page 24, line 11 - page 29, line 20 * * figures 1,4,5 *; | [A]US2013283257 (SEN ABHISHEK [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0096] ** figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]US2014137101 (CHAN MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] * * figures 1,5 * |