EP3333825 - METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR CHECKING AN AVERAGE SPEED OF A VEHICLE IN A SECTION OF ROAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Idemia Identity & Security France 2, Place Samuel de Champlain 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2019/03] |
Former [2018/24] | For all designated states Safran Identity & Security 11, boulevard Gallieni 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINTER, Christian c/o SAFRAN IDENTITY & SECURITY 11boulevard Galliéni 92130 ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/24] | Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 3, impasse de la Vigie CS 71840 35418 Saint-Malo Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 16306662.4 | 12.12.2016 | [2018/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3333825 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/017, G08G1/054 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
G08G1/0175 (EP);
G08G1/054 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/01] |
Former [2018/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR PRÜFUNG EINER DURCHSCHNITTSGESCHWINDIGKEIT EINES FAHRZEUGES IN EINEM STRASSENABSCHNITT | [2018/24] | English: | METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR CHECKING AN AVERAGE SPEED OF A VEHICLE IN A SECTION OF ROAD | [2018/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR VÉRIFIER UNE VITESSE MOYENNE D'UN VÉHICULE DANS UN TRONÇON DE ROUTE | [2018/24] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/01] | 26.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.05.2022 | 30.05.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/45] | 01.07.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/45] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.03.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 16.03.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.03.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102008028944 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0031] ** paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0058] * |