EP3208015 - METHOD OF SINTERING ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTING POWDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/34] | METHOD OF SINTERING ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTING POWDERS AND AN APPARATUS FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | ||
[2018/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fundación Tecnalia Research & Innovation Parque Cientifico y Tecnológico de Bizkaia C/ Geldo, Edificio 700 48160 Derio - Bizkaia / ES | For all designated states Universidad de Sevilla Pabellón de Brasil P° de las Delicias, s/n 41013 Sevilla / ES | [2017/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONTES MARTOS, Juan Manuel Universidad de Sevilla, Escuela Técnica Superior de Ingeniería Paseo de las Delicias s/n Pabellón de Brasil 41013 Sevilla / ES | 02 /
CINTAS FÍSICO, Jesús Universidad de Sevilla, Escuela Técnica Superior de Ingeniería Paseo de las Delicias s/n Pabellón de Brasil 41013 Sevilla / ES | 03 /
GALLARDO FUENTES, José María Universidad de Sevilla, Escuela Técnica Superior de Ingeniería Paseo de las Delicias s/n Pabellón de Brasil 41013 Sevilla / ES | 04 /
DE PAULA GÓMEZ CUEVAS, Francisco Universidad de Huelva Escuela Técnica Superior de Ingeniería Carretera De la Rábida, 0 S/N 21810 Palos de la Frontera, Huelva / ES | 05 /
TORRES HERNÁNDEZ, Yadir Universidad de Sevilla Escuela Técnica Superior de Ingeniería Paseo de las Delicias s/n, Pabellón de Brasil 41013 Sevilla / ES | 06 /
AGOTE BELOQUI, Íñigo Parque Científico y Tecnológico de Bizkaia C/ Geldo, Edificio 700 48160 Derio - Bizkaia / ES | 07 /
LAGOS GÓMEZ, Miguel Ángel Parque Científico y Tecnológico de Bizkaia C/ Geldo, Edificio 700 48160 Derio - Bizkaia / ES | 08 /
IRAZUSTA ARRUTI, Aitor Parque Científico y Tecnológico de Bizkaia C/ Geldo, Edificio 700 48160 Derio - Bizkaia / ES | [2017/34] | Representative(s) | Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 93 5ª planta 28046 Madrid / ES | [2019/18] |
Former [2017/34] | Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 93 5a planta 28046 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 16382069.9 | 19.02.2016 | [2017/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3208015 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3208015 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/087, B01J19/08, B22F3/105, B30B11/00, // B22F3/16, C22C21/00, C22C29/08, C22C29/10, C22C32/00, C22C14/00 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
B22F3/105 (EP,CN,US);
B22F3/003 (CN);
B22F3/087 (EP,US);
B22F3/14 (CN);
B22F2003/1051 (EP,US);
B22F2201/50 (EP,US);
B22F2202/06 (EP,US);
B22F2301/15 (EP,US);
B22F2301/205 (EP,US);
B22F2301/40 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US);
B22F3/164 (EP,US);
C22C14/00 (EP,US);
C22C21/00 (EP,US);
C22C29/08 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/34] | B22F3/087, B01J19/08, B22F3/105, B30B11/00, // B22F3/16, C22C21/00, C22C29/08, C22C29/10, C22C32/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] |
Former [2017/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SINTERN VON ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGEN PULVERN | [2018/50] | English: | METHOD OF SINTERING ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTING POWDERS | [2018/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FRITTAGE DE POUDRES ÉLECTRIQUEMENT CONDUCTRICES | [2018/50] |
Former [2017/34] | VERFAHREN ZUM SINTERN VON ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGEN PULVERN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES BESAGTEN VERFAHRENS | ||
Former [2017/34] | METHOD OF SINTERING ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTING POWDERS AND AN APPARATUS FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | ||
Former [2017/34] | PROCÉDÉ DE FRITTAGE DE POUDRES ÉLECTRIQUEMENT CONDUCTRICES ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE METTRE EN OEUVRE LEDIT PROCÉDÉ | Examination procedure | 19.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 13.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.02.2016 | AL | 01.05.2019 | AT | 01.05.2019 | CY | 01.05.2019 | CZ | 01.05.2019 | EE | 01.05.2019 | GR | 01.05.2019 | HR | 01.05.2019 | LT | 01.05.2019 | LV | 01.05.2019 | MC | 01.05.2019 | MK | 01.05.2019 | MT | 01.05.2019 | NL | 01.05.2019 | PL | 01.05.2019 | RO | 01.05.2019 | RS | 01.05.2019 | SI | 01.05.2019 | SK | 01.05.2019 | SM | 01.05.2019 | TR | 01.05.2019 | BG | 01.08.2019 | NO | 01.08.2019 | IS | 01.09.2019 | PT | 01.09.2019 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 19.02.2016 | |
AL | 01.05.2019 | ||
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
MK | 01.05.2019 | ||
MT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 19.02.2016 | |
AL | 01.05.2019 | ||
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
MT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | LT | 01.05.2019 | |
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | LT | 01.05.2019 | |
NO | 01.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH03236402 (SUMITOMO COAL MINING) [X] 9-15 * abstract * * page 2, columns 1-2 * [Y] 3; | [XDAY]US5529746 (KNOESS WALTER [DE], et al) [XD] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, lines 46-64 * * column 4, lines 50-63; claims 1-11 * [A] 4-8 [Y] 3; | [A] - ORRU R ET AL, "Consolidation/synthesis of materials by electric current activated/assisted sintering", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING R: REPORTS, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 63, no. 4-6, doi:10.1016/J.MSER.2008.09.003, ISSN 0927-796X, (20090212), pages 127 - 287, (20090108), XP025914673 [A] 1 * page 131, column 2 - page 132, column 2 * * page 132 - page 134 * * page 195, column 2, paragraph 3; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mser.2008.09.003 | by applicant | US2355954 | US3241956 | US3508029 | US4929415 | US4975412 | US5529746 | US7361301 | EP2198993 |