EP3211620 - METHOD AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR ESTABLISHING OPTIMIZED HOLDING PATTERNS FOR AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2019 | Deletion: Date of oral proceedings | 26.04.2019 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | 26.04.2019 | Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 26.04.2019 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2017/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE PRINS, Johan The Boing Company Avda. Sur Del Aeropuerto de Barajas, 38 28042 Madrid / ES | 02 /
KLEIN KOERKAMP, Niek The Boing Company Avda. Sur Del Aeropuerto de Barajas, 38 28042 Madrid / ES | 03 /
FIGLAR, Bastian The Boing Company Avda. Sur Del Aeropuerto de Barajas, 38 28042 Madrid / ES | [2017/35] | Representative(s) | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [2017/35] | Application number, filing date | 16382080.6 | 26.02.2016 | [2017/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3211620 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G08G5/00, G06Q10/04 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
G08G5/0052 (EP,US);
G06Q10/047 (EP,US);
G08G5/0021 (EP,US);
G08G5/0091 (US);
G08G5/0039 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERSTELLUNG OPTIMIERTER WARTESCHLEIFEN FÜR FLUGZEUGE | [2017/35] | English: | METHOD AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR ESTABLISHING OPTIMIZED HOLDING PATTERNS FOR AIRCRAFT | [2017/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE POUR ÉTABLIR DES MOTIFS DE MAINTIEN OPTIMISÉ POUR AÉRONEF | [2017/35] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2016 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 26.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/21] | 15.04.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.05.2019 | 28.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2980774 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0005] - [0007] - [0011] - [0015] - [0023] - [0035] *; | [X]US8700317 (WILDER BRUCE GARY [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 2, lines 48-67 * * column 4, lines 5-12,66 - column 5, line 15 * * column 6, lines 5-65 * * column 7, line 45 - column 8, line 56 * |