EP3213909 - IMPACT RESISTANT SANDWICH STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations, S.L. Avenida John Lennon s/nº 28906 Getafe (Madrid) / ES | [2017/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEREIRA MOSQUEIRA, Fernando AIRBUS OPERATIONS, S.L. Av. John Lennon s/n 28906 GETAFE (Madrid) / ES | 02 /
MARASCO, Andrea Ivan AIRBUS OPERATIONS, S.L. Av. John Lennon s/n 28906 GETAFE (Madrid) / ES | 03 /
MARTINO GONZALEZ, Esteban AIRBUS OPERATIONS, S.L. Av. John Lennon s/n 28906 GETAFE (Madrid) / ES | [2017/36] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2017/36] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros 1 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 16382098.8 | 04.03.2016 | [2017/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3213909 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B29D99/00, B29C65/00, B32B5/26, B32B5/28, B32B7/02, B32B15/01, B32B15/20, B32B3/02, B32B3/12 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
B32B3/12 (EP,US);
B29D99/0089 (EP,US);
B32B15/01 (EP,US);
B32B15/016 (EP,US);
B32B15/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/20 (US);
B32B3/02 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
B32B5/28 (EP,US);
B32B7/03 (EP,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
B64C1/062 (EP,US);
B64C1/12 (EP,US);
B64D45/00 (EP,US);
B32B2250/03 (EP,US);
B32B2250/05 (EP,US);
B32B2250/40 (EP,US);
B32B2307/50 (EP,US);
B32B2307/558 (US);
B32B2571/00 (US);
B32B2605/18 (EP,US);
B64D2045/0095 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] |
Former [2017/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLAGZÄHE SANDWICHSTRUKTUR | [2017/36] | English: | IMPACT RESISTANT SANDWICH STRUCTURE | [2017/36] | French: | STRUCTURE SANDWICH RÉSISTANT AUX CHOCS | [2017/36] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 14.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/14] | 25.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/14] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.06.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 14.06.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.06.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1125704 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) |