EP3225887 - ELECTRONIC GEARSHIFT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fico Triad, S.A. Gran Vía Carlos III, 98, 5ª planta 08028 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | For all designated states Fico Triad, S.A. Gran Vía Carles III, 98, 5ª planta 08028 Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIMENO GRANÉ, Santiago c/o Fico Triad, S. A. Polígono Industrial Can Mitjans, s/n 08232 Viladecavalls / ES | 02 /
MORENO COLOM, Javier c/o Fico Triad, S. A. Polígono Industrial Can Mitjans s/n 08232 Viladecavalls / ES | 03 /
DI VIRGILIO, Vito c/o Fico Triad, S. A. Polígono Industrial Can Mitjans s/n 08232 Viladecavalls / ES | 04 /
FERRÉ RIPOLL, Jaume No.518, Suzhou Middle Road, Economy Developing Area TAICANG CITY / CN | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla de Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor 08002 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 16382142.4 | 31.03.2016 | [2017/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3225887 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16H63/34 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
F16H61/12 (EP);
F16H63/3475 (EP);
F16H63/3491 (EP);
F16H2061/1224 (EP);
F16H2061/326 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE GANGSCHALTVORRICHTUNG | [2017/40] | English: | ELECTRONIC GEARSHIFT DEVICE | [2017/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHANGEMENT DE VITESSES ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2017/40] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/40] | 14.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2003188595 (KROPP JENS-UWE [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6-13,15 * figures 5a, 5b * * paragraphs [0003] , [0 33] , [0 48] , [0 50] , [ 53] - [0054] * [Y] 14 [I] 4,5,14; | [XY]US8560193 (KRISHNASWAMI RAM [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0029] , [0 30]; figures 4, 5 * [Y] 14; | [Y]DE102014219037 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [Y] 14 * figure 1 * | by applicant | US7832302 |