EP3290188 - METHOD FOR REINFORCING A PHOTOPOLYMERIZABLE DIFFUSE REFLECTIVE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lithoz GmbH Mollardgasse 85a/2/64-69 1060 Wien / AT | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reiter, Rafael Marktgasse 4/1/2 A-1090 Wien / AT | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Keschmann, Marc Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte GmbH Schottengasse 3a 1010 Wien / AT | [2018/10] | Application number, filing date | 16450022.5 | 30.08.2016 | [2018/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3290188 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/00 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
B29C64/135 (EP,US);
B29C64/255 (US);
B33Y10/00 (US);
B33Y30/00 (US);
B29C64/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERFESTIGEN EINES PHOTOPOLYMERISIERBAREN, DIFFUS REFLEKTIERENDEN MATERIALS | [2018/10] | English: | METHOD FOR REINFORCING A PHOTOPOLYMERIZABLE DIFFUSE REFLECTIVE MATERIAL | [2018/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONSOLIDATION D'UN MATÉRIAU RÉFLÉCHISSANT DE MANIÈRE DIFFUSE ET PHOTOPOLYMÉRALISABLE. | [2018/10] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 16.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]GB2477828 (UNIV WARWICK [GB]) [X] 10,11,14 * claims 11-15 * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 17 * [A] 1-9[I] 12,13,15-18; | [XAI]WO2015128783 (COSTABEBER ETTORE MAURIZIO [IT]) [X] 10,11,14 * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 10 * * claim - * [A] 1-9 [I] 12,13,15-18 | by applicant | WO2010045950 | EP2505341 |