EP3290864 - DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING A POSITION OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nicosevici, Tudor Str. Pelicanului Nr. 59 300328 Timisoara / RO | 02 /
Son, Andrei Str. Euripide Nr. 29 300588 Timisoara / RO | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Reuter, Andreas Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Intellectual Property Sieboldstraße 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2018/10] | Application number, filing date | 16465529.2 | 30.08.2016 | [2018/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3290864 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/28 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
G06T7/74 (EP,US);
G01C21/28 (EP,US);
G06F18/28 (US);
G06V10/464 (EP,US);
G06V10/772 (EP,US);
G06V20/56 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRERASSISTENZSYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER POSITION EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2018/10] | English: | DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING A POSITION OF A VEHICLE | [2018/10] | French: | SYSTEME D'ASSISTANCE AU CONDUCTEUR DESTINE A DETERMINER UNE POSITION D'UN VEHICULE | [2018/10] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 16.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP2372605 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,11 * paragraphs [0027] - [0031] - [0039] - [0047]; figure 4 * [Y] 4-10; | [A]US2015049943 (HAMSICI ONUR C [US]) [A] 4-10* the whole document *; | [Y]US2015269438 (SAMARASEKERA SUPUN [US], et al) [Y] 4-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] - [0033] - [0037] , [0040] - [0042] - [0060] - [0062] - [0066] - [0067] - [0080] - [0083] - [0087] - [0090] - [0093] - [0103] * |