EP3243027 - FIREPROOF WALL, IN PARTICULAR FOR A COMBUSTION FURNACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mokesys Ag Freulerstrasse 10 4127 Birsfelden / CH | [2017/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERN, Tobias Im Sesselacker 23 4059 Basel / CH | [2017/46] | Representative(s) | Bohest AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | [2017/46] | Application number, filing date | 16700521.4 | 06.01.2016 | [2017/46] | WO2016CH00004 | Priority number, date | CH20150001615 | 07.01.2015 Original published format: CH 16152015 | [2017/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016109904 | Date: | 14.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3243027 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3243027 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F22B37/36, F23M5/08 | [2017/46] | CPC: |
F22B37/36 (EP);
F23G5/48 (EP);
F23M5/02 (EP);
F23M5/04 (EP);
F23M5/08 (EP);
F23M2900/05001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEUERFESTE WAND, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSOFEN | [2017/46] | English: | FIREPROOF WALL, IN PARTICULAR FOR A COMBUSTION FURNACE | [2017/46] | French: | PAROI RÉFRACTAIRE, EN PARTICULIER POUR FOUR DE COMBUSTION | [2017/46] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/46] | 24.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.01.2016 | AL | 26.09.2018 | CY | 26.09.2018 | CZ | 26.09.2018 | EE | 26.09.2018 | HR | 26.09.2018 | LT | 26.09.2018 | LV | 26.09.2018 | MC | 26.09.2018 | MK | 26.09.2018 | MT | 26.09.2018 | RO | 26.09.2018 | RS | 26.09.2018 | SI | 26.09.2018 | SK | 26.09.2018 | SM | 26.09.2018 | TR | 26.09.2018 | BG | 26.12.2018 | GR | 27.12.2018 | IE | 06.01.2019 | IS | 26.01.2019 | PT | 26.01.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 06.01.2016 | |
AL | 26.09.2018 | ||
CY | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IE | 06.01.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CY | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IE | 06.01.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IE | 06.01.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IE | 06.01.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IE | 06.01.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | HR | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 26.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB678206 (VITKOVICE ZELEZARNY, et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US4426937 (SIETMANN VERNON H [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US4441324 (ABE TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0166133 (KOCH THEODOR) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9107273U (NOELL) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19706077 (LOESCHE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [ID]CH699406 (MOKESYS AG [CH]) [ID] 1-3,5,9,10 * paragraphs [0015] - [0020]; figures 1,2,5,8 * | by applicant | CH699406 |