|
20.04.2021 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2020 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.11.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.11.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
24.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.06.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2018 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2017 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
26.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2017 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.06.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.06.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.08.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
04.08.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.08.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.08.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |