EP3223980 - ADDITIVE PRODUCTION METHOD USING THICKER POWDER LAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/40] | ADDITIVE PRODUCTION METHOD USING THICKER POWDER LAYERS, AND COMPONENT | ||
[2020/48] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2021/04] |
Former [2017/40] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUNHUBER, Christian Zogenreuth 6 91275 Auerbach / DE | 02 /
SOLLER, Thomas Jahnstrasse 11 94469 Deggendorf / DE | 03 /
REGNERY, David Zedernweg 19 47228 Duisburg / DE | [2017/40] | Application number, filing date | 16700568.5 | 13.01.2016 | [2017/40] | WO2016EP50550 | Priority number, date | DE201510201686 | 30.01.2015 Original published format: DE102015201686 | [2017/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016120069 | Date: | 04.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3223980 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B22F1/00, B22F3/105, B29C67/00, B33Y10/00, B29C64/153 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
B29C64/153 (EP,US);
B22F10/00 (CN);
B22F1/052 (EP,CN,US);
B22F1/06 (EP,CN,US);
B22F10/28 (EP,CN,US);
B22F12/67 (EP,CN,US);
B23K26/144 (US);
B23K26/342 (US);
B23K26/70 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/40] | B22F1/00, B22F3/105, B29C67/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Title | German: | ADDITIVES HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG DICKERER PULVERSCHICHTEN | [2020/48] | English: | ADDITIVE PRODUCTION METHOD USING THICKER POWDER LAYERS | [2020/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE AU MOYEN DE COUCHES DE POUDRE ÉPAISSES | [2020/48] |
Former [2017/40] | ADDITIVES HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG DICKERER PULVERSCHICHTEN UND BAUTEIL | ||
Former [2017/40] | ADDITIVE PRODUCTION METHOD USING THICKER POWDER LAYERS, AND COMPONENT | ||
Former [2017/40] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE AU MOYEN DE COUCHES DE POUDRE ÉPAISSES, ET PIÈCE | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 21.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/36] | 20.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19818469 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,9 * example 1 * * figures 11,12 *; | [XY]EP0946325 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 21] , [0023] , [0 26] , [0 28] * * figure 1 * [Y] 6,7; | [Y]DE102004008054 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0056] , [0 57] *; | [Y]DE102006056422 (CL SCHUTZRECHTSVERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 7 * figure 7 * * page 1 *; | [XI]US2012237745 (DIERKES STEPHAN [DE], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 137] , [ 138] * * figure 1 * [I] 8; | [A]FR2998496 (ASS POUR LA RECH ET LE DEV DE METHODES ET PROCESSUS IND ARMINES [FR], et al) [A] 2,8 * page 5, lines 5-10 * * page 15, line 31 - page 16, line 11 ** page 13, lines 21-32 *; | [XYI]US2014348692 (BESSAC CHRISTOPHE [FR], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0013] , [0 16] - [0020] - [0 68] * * figure 1 * [Y] 6 [I] 2-5 |