EP3247492 - MULTI-ZONED CATALYST SYSTEM FOR OXIDATION OF O-XYLENE AND/OR NAPHTHALENE TO PHTHALIC ANHYDRIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2017/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALEANO NUNEZ, Diana Carolina Dürerstraße 43-45 68163 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
WALSDORFF, Christian Wittelsbachstraße 61 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
ZUEHLKE, Jürgen Sankt-Klara-Kloster-Weg 23 67346 Speyer / DE | 04 /
ALLMANN, Hans-Martin Luisenstraße 18 74867 Neunkirchen / DE | [2017/48] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/48] | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 16700589.1 | 14.01.2016 | [2017/48] | WO2016EP50601 | Priority number, date | EP20150152057 | 22.01.2015 Original published format: EP 15152057 | [2017/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016116340 | Date: | 28.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3247492 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/18, B01J23/22, B01J21/06, B01J35/10, B01J35/00, C07C51/265, C07C63/16 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
B01J23/22 (EP,CN,US);
B01J35/19 (EP,CN,US);
B01J21/063 (EP,CN,US);
B01J23/002 (EP,CN,US);
B01J23/18 (EP,CN,US);
B01J27/198 (EP,CN,US);
B01J35/61 (EP,CN,US);
B01J37/0219 (EP,CN,US);
B01J37/0221 (US);
B01J37/0236 (US);
B01J37/08 (US);
C07C51/265 (EP,CN,US);
C07C51/313 (EP,US);
C07D307/89 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00 (EP,CN,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,CN,US);
B01J35/50 (EP,CN,US);
B01J35/613 (EP,CN,US);
B01J37/0223 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/265, C07C63/16 (US,CN,EP);
C07C51/313, C07C63/16 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/15, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/53, B01J2523/55 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/51, B01J2523/53, B01J2523/55 (US,EP,CN) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] | Title | German: | KATALYSATORSYSTEM MIT MEHREREN ZONEN ZUR OXIDIERUNG VON O-XYLEN UND/ODER NAPHTHALEN ZU PHTHALSÄUREANHYDRID | [2017/48] | English: | MULTI-ZONED CATALYST SYSTEM FOR OXIDATION OF O-XYLENE AND/OR NAPHTHALENE TO PHTHALIC ANHYDRIDE | [2017/48] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CATALYSEUR À MULTIPLES ZONES DESTINÉ À UNE OXYDATION D'O-XYLÈNE ET/OU DE NAPHTALÈNE EN ANHYDRIDE PHTALIQUE | [2017/48] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 26.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/22] | 29.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004103943 (BASF AG [DE], et al); | [X]WO2004103561 (BASF AG [DE], et al); | [X]WO2011032658 (SUED CHEMIE AG [DE], et al); | [X]WO2014207603 (BASF SE [DE], et al) | by applicant | DE4006935 | US5169820 | EP0522871 | DE19839001 | WO2004014819 | WO2005115615 | EP1636161 | WO2006125467 | US2009306409 | WO2010022830 | US2011124885 | US2014213801 |