EP3403471 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN OPERATING POINT OF A SET OF ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Ebenoid 817 rue Nicephore Niepce Parc des Lumieres ZAC de la Fouillouse 69800 Saint Priest / FR | [2018/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALOMBO, Sylvain 5 rue chapillon 69390 Vernaison / FR | [2019/15] |
Former [2018/47] | 01 /
PALOMBO, Sylvain 22 Rroute de Champemin 69390 Vourles / FR | Representative(s) | Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/47] | Verriest, Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 16701262.4 | 14.01.2016 | [2018/47] | WO2016EP50638 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017121479 | Date: | 20.07.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3403471 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2018/47] | CPC: |
H05B45/48 (EP);
H05B45/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES ARBEITSPUNKTES EINES SATZES ELEKTRONISCHER KOMPONENTEN | [2018/47] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN OPERATING POINT OF A SET OF ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS | [2018/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN POINT DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN ENSEMBLE DE COMPOSANTS ÉLECTRONIQUES | [2018/47] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/47] | 18.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/51] | 30.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 14.08.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2008116818 (SHTEYNBERG ANATOLY [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0088]; figures 7, 11, 14A-B *; | [XI]US2012081009 (SHTEYNBERG ANATOLY [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0248] - paragraph [0314]; figures 22-25 * [I] 12; | [A]US2012176826 (LAZAR JAMES FREDERICK [US]) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0143]; figures 4A, 4F, 4G * |