EP3247791 - UNIVERSAL KILLER T-CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oslo Universitetssykehus HF Postboks 4950 Nydalen 0424 Oslo / NO | [2017/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÄLCHLI, Sébastien Sørkedalsveien 11F 0369 Oslo / NO | 02 /
INDERBERG, Else Marit Nedre Skøyen vei 20 0276 Oslo / NO | 03 /
GAUDERNACK, Gustav Anthon Walles vei 17A 1337 Sandvika / NO | 04 /
KVALHEIM, Gunnar Åsstubben 13 0381 Oslo / NO | [2022/18] |
Former [2017/48] | 01 /
WÄLCHLI, Sébastien Sørkedalsveien 11F 0369 Oslo / NO | ||
02 /
SUSO, Else Marit Inderberg Skøyen Terrasse 18 0276 Oslo / NO | |||
03 /
GAUDERNACK, Gustav Anthon Walles vei 17A 1337 Sandvika / NO | |||
04 /
KVALHEIM, Gunnar Åsstubben 13 0381 Oslo / NO | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/18] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2017/48] | Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16701339.0 | 22.01.2016 | [2017/48] | WO2016EP51344 | Priority number, date | GB20150001175 | 23.01.2015 Original published format: GB 201501175 | [2017/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016116601 | Date: | 28.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3247791 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3247791 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61P35/00, C12N5/0783 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
C12N5/0646 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K2239/28 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/4613 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/4632 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/464434 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/464457 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/464491 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL);
C07K14/7051 (IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/48] | C12N5/0783 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNIVERSELLE T-KILLERZELLE | [2017/48] | English: | UNIVERSAL KILLER T-CELL | [2017/48] | French: | LYMPHOCYTE T CYTOTOXIQUE UNIVERSEL | [2017/48] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 31.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22170488.5 / EP4095239 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 04.05.2022 | EE | 04.05.2022 | HR | 04.05.2022 | LT | 04.05.2022 | LV | 04.05.2022 | MC | 04.05.2022 | RO | 04.05.2022 | RS | 04.05.2022 | SI | 04.05.2022 | SK | 04.05.2022 | SM | 04.05.2022 | BG | 04.08.2022 | IS | 04.09.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/25] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | EE | 04.05.2022 | |
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | HR | 04.05.2022 | |
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | HR | 04.05.2022 | |
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | HR | 04.05.2022 | |
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | LT | 04.05.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006023148 (CAMPBELL KERRY S [US]); |