EP3247697 - PROCESS FOR THE RACEMIZATION OF ENANTIOMERICALLY ENRICHED 1-AMINOINDANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/48] | PROCESS AND INTERMEDIATES FOR THE RACEMIZATION OF ENANTIOMERICALLY ENRICHED 1-AMINOINDANE | ||
[2019/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Farma GRS, d.o.o. Seidlova cesta 70 8000 Novo mesto / SI | [2017/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUZIC, Milos Ulica Milke Kerinove 9 3000 Celje / SI | 02 /
KRALJ, David Jezero 40 8210 Trebnje / SI | 03 /
KLOBCAR, Andrej Na zago 11 8351 Straza / SI | 04 /
PRUDIC, Darja Smolenja vas 68c 8000 Novo mesto / SI | 05 /
PLEVNIK, Miha Ulica Cankarjeve brigade 16 1295 Ivancna Gorica / SI | 06 /
PECAVAR, Anica Gotna vas 18 8000 Novo mesto / SI | 07 /
PLAPER, Igor Smarjeske Toplice 128 8220 Smarjeske Toplice / SI | 08 /
PUCELJ, Joze Avsiceva ulica 16 8000 Novo mesto / SI | [2020/02] |
Former [2017/48] | 01 /
RUZIC, Milos Ulica Milke Kerineove 9 3000 Celje / SI | ||
02 /
KRALJ, David Jezero 40 8210 Trebnje / SI | |||
03 /
KLOBCAR, Andrej Podbreznik 110 8000 Novo mesto / SI | |||
04 /
PRUDIC, Darja Smolenja vas 68c 8000 Novo mesto / SI | |||
05 /
PLEVNIK, Miha Ulica Cankarjeve brigade 16 1295 Ivancna Gorica / SI | |||
06 /
PECAVAR, Anica Gotna vas 18 8000 Novo mesto / SI | |||
07 /
PLAPER, Igor Smarjeske Toplice 128 8220 Smarjeske Toplice / SI | |||
08 /
PUCELJ, Joze Avsiceva ulica 16 8000 Novo mesto / SI | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2017/48] | Application number, filing date | 16701340.8 | 22.01.2016 | [2017/48] | WO2016EP51356 | Priority number, date | SI20150000008 | 22.01.2015 Original published format: SI 201500008 | [2017/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016116607 | Date: | 28.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3247697 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3247697 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/16, C07C209/52, C07C211/42, C07C251/20 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
C07C251/20 (EP);
C07C209/16 (EP);
C07C209/52 (EP);
C07C2602/08 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C209/16, C07C211/42 (EP);
C07C209/52, C07C211/42 (EP) |
Former IPC [2017/48] | C07C209/08, C07C209/26, C07C209/52, C07C211/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR RACEMISIERUNG VON ENANTIOMERENANGEREICHERTEM 1-AMINOINDAN | [2019/39] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE RACEMIZATION OF ENANTIOMERICALLY ENRICHED 1-AMINOINDANE | [2019/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA RACÉMISATION DE 1-AMINOINDANE ÉNANTIOMÉRIQUEMENT ENRICHI | [2019/39] |
Former [2017/48] | VERFAHREN UND ZWISCHENPRODUKTE ZUR RACEMISIERUNG VON ENANTIOMER ANGEREICHERTEM 1-AMINOINDAN | ||
Former [2017/48] | PROCESS AND INTERMEDIATES FOR THE RACEMIZATION OF ENANTIOMERICALLY ENRICHED 1-AMINOINDANE | ||
Former [2017/48] | PROCÉDÉ ET INTERMÉDIAIRES POUR LA RACÉMISATION DE 1-AMINOINDANE ÉNANTIOMÉRIQUEMENT ENRICHI | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 17.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.01.2016 | AL | 08.01.2020 | AT | 08.01.2020 | CY | 08.01.2020 | CZ | 08.01.2020 | DK | 08.01.2020 | EE | 08.01.2020 | ES | 08.01.2020 | FI | 08.01.2020 | HR | 08.01.2020 | IT | 08.01.2020 | LT | 08.01.2020 | LV | 08.01.2020 | MC | 08.01.2020 | MK | 08.01.2020 | MT | 08.01.2020 | NL | 08.01.2020 | PL | 08.01.2020 | RO | 08.01.2020 | RS | 08.01.2020 | SE | 08.01.2020 | SK | 08.01.2020 | SM | 08.01.2020 | TR | 08.01.2020 | IE | 22.01.2020 | LU | 22.01.2020 | BE | 31.01.2020 | CH | 31.01.2020 | LI | 31.01.2020 | FR | 08.03.2020 | BG | 08.04.2020 | GB | 08.04.2020 | NO | 08.04.2020 | GR | 09.04.2020 | IS | 08.05.2020 | PT | 31.05.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 22.01.2016 | |
AL | 08.01.2020 | ||
AT | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IE | 22.01.2020 | ||
LU | 22.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
FR | 08.03.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GB | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.01.2016 | |
AT | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IE | 22.01.2020 | ||
LU | 22.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
FR | 08.03.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GB | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
IE | 22.01.2020 | ||
LU | 22.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
FR | 08.03.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GB | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
IE | 22.01.2020 | ||
LU | 22.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
FR | 08.03.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
IE | 22.01.2020 | ||
LU | 22.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
FR | 08.03.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
LU | 22.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
LU | 22.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
LU | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
LU | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
LU | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
LU | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 08.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XD]US4833273 (GOEL OM P [US]) [XD] 11 * example 2 *; | [AD]WO2012116752 (SYNTHON BV [NL], et al) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A] - GUOZHEN MA ET AL, "A Novel Synthesis of Rasagiline via a Chemoenzymatic Dynamic Kinetic Resolution", ORGANIC PROCESS RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, US, (20141017), vol. 18, no. 10, doi:10.1021/op500152g, ISSN 1083-6160, pages 1169 - 1174, XP055258423 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/op500152g | [A] - REAXYS, Elsevier Properties SA, Database accession no. 1073457, XP002755712 [A] 11 * Reaxys RN: 1073457 * | [ ] - JUSTUS LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE, (1964), vol. 679, pages 83 - 94 | [A] - RODIONOV V N ET AL, "Selective reductive dimerization of homocubane series oximes", RUSSIAN JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, NAUKA/INTERPERIODICA, MO, (20111208), vol. 47, no. 11, doi:10.1134/S1070428011110078, ISSN 1608-3393, pages 1695 - 1702, XP019988595 [A] 11 * The whole document, in particular schemes 1 and 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1134/S1070428011110078 | [A] - REAXYS, Elsevier Properties SA, Database accession no. 161544, XP002755713 [A] 11 * Reaxys RN: 161544 * | [ ] - COMPTES RENDUS HEBDOMADAIRES DES SEANCES DE L'ACADEMIE DES SCIENCES, (1920), vol. 170, page 937 | [A] - REAXYS, Elsevier Properties SA, Database accession no. 7054815, XP002755714 [A] 11 * Reaxys RN: 7054815 * | [ ] - ANNALES DE CHIMIE, (1934), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 225 - 242 |