|
18.03.2025 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2025 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.01.2025 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2025 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2025 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.01.2025 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.01.2025 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2024 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2024 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2024 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.10.2024 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2024 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
104 |
|
10.10.2024 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
104 |
|
30.08.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2024 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2024 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2024 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2024 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.04.2024 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2024 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
104 |
|
30.04.2024 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
104 |
|
01.03.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.03.2024 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.03.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2024 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.10.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.10.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
104 |
|
27.10.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
104 |
|
17.07.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
17.07.2023 |
Description |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
17.07.2023 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2023 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2023 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2023 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2023 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
19.01.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
19.01.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
19.01.2023 |
Description |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
19.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2023 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.01.2023 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2023 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2022 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2022 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.06.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
27.06.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.06.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
27.06.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.02.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.2022 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.07.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
26.07.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.07.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
26.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2020 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.08.2020 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.03.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.08.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
76 |
|
08.08.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
79 |
|
08.08.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
70 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
110 |
|
24.03.2016 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
23.03.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
23.03.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.03.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
56 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
50 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Fee calculation sheet for an international application |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
5 |