|
23.07.2024 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2024 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2024 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2024 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.06.2024 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.02.2024 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2024 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2024 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.02.2024 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2024 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
16.02.2024 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
02.02.2024 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.01.2024 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
26.01.2024 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.01.2024 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
26.01.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2024 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.01.2024 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2023 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2023 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.06.2023 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2021 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2021 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.07.2021 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2021 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2020 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.10.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2020 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.08.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2020 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.01.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.01.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2017 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.06.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.08.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
04.08.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
29.06.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
29.06.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
29.06.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
05.02.2016 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
26.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
17 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Incoming communication concerning PCT Direct |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
28 |