07.06.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
05.06.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.06.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.06.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
16.02.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.02.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
09.02.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
09.02.2024 |
Change - German title |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
03.02.2024 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
02.02.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
29.01.2024 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
26.01.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.01.2024 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.10.2023 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.06.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.02.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.02.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.09.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
16.07.2021 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.04.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.02.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.10.2020 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
12.10.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
12.10.2020 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
09.10.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.08.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.05.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.02.2020 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
03.02.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2020 |
First examination report |
|
06.01.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.02.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
30.03.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
03.02.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.11.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
03.11.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
03.11.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
09.10.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.07.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
25.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.07.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.08.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.08.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|