blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3250272

EP3250272 - ADAPTER FOR A NEEDLE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.12.2019
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.11.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SANOFI
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[2017/49]
Inventor(s)01 / PLOCH, Markus
c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 [2017/49]
Representative(s)Finger, Catrin
Liedtke & Partner
Patentanwälte
Gerhart-Hauptmann-Strasse 10/11
99096 Erfurt / DE
[2017/49]
Application number, filing date16701959.529.01.2016
[2017/49]
WO2016EP51931
Priority number, dateEP2015030510629.01.2015         Original published format: EP 15305106
[2017/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2016120453
Date:04.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3250272
Date:06.12.2017
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2017/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.08.2016
ClassificationIPC:A61M5/32, A61M5/34, A61M5/24
[2017/49]
CPC:
A61M5/345 (EP,US); A61M5/2466 (US); A61M5/3293 (EP,US);
A61M5/344 (US); A61M5/347 (EP,US); A61M5/348 (EP,US);
A61M2207/00 (US); A61M5/24 (EP,US); A61M5/3202 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/49]
TitleGerman:ADAPTER FÜR EINE NADELANORDNUNG[2017/49]
English:ADAPTER FOR A NEEDLE ASSEMBLY[2017/49]
French:ADAPTATEUR POUR ENSEMBLE D'AIGUILLE[2017/49]
Entry into regional phase29.08.2017National basic fee paid 
29.08.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
29.08.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.08.2017Examination requested  [2017/49]
07.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.08.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2020/01]
29.08.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2020/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201904   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[IA]WO2012160165  (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al) [I] 1,2,4-7 * page 12, lines 15-32 * * page 13, line 23 - page 14, line 19 * * figures 1-4b * [A] 3,8-15;
 [IA]WO03047664  (SEGAL ALAN J [GB]) [I] 1,2,4-7 * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 15 * * page 12, line 14 - page 13, line 8 * * figures 1a,1b,2,5 * [A] 3,8-15;
 [A]EP0787501  (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * column 4, lines 3-10; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]WO2009137486  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 7, line 7 - page 8, line 10; figures 1-3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.