EP3247768 - NAPHTHYL SUBSTITUTED ORGANIC MOLECULES FOR USE IN OPTOELECTRONIC COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/48] | NAPTHYL-SUBSTITUTED ORGANIC MOLECULES FOR USE IN OPTOELECTRONIC COMPONENTS | ||
[2018/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states cynora GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Strasse 2-6 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2017/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMBROSEK, David Raumerstr. 19 10437 Berlin / DE | 02 /
DANZ, Michael Nagoldstraße 7g 76344 Eggenstein-Leopoldshafen / DE | 03 /
FLÜGGE, Harald Goethestraße 50 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | 04 /
FRIEDRICHS, Jana Hirschstraße 108 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | 05 /
GRAB, Tobias Kaiserallee 17a 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | 06 /
JACOB, Andreas Dieckbornstrasse 44 30449 Hannover / DE | 07 /
SEIFERMANN, Stefan Hardkopfweg 3 77815 Brühl / DE | 08 /
VOLZ, Daniel Roonstr. 7 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | 09 /
MYDLAK, Mathias Friedenstrasse 25 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [2019/11] |
Former [2017/48] | 01 /
AMBROSEK, David Raumerstr. 19 10437 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
DANZ, Michael Nagoldstraße 7g 76344 Eggenstein-Leopoldshafen / DE | |||
03 /
FLÜGGE, Harald Goethestraße 50 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
04 /
FRIEDRICHS, Jana Hirschstraße 108 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
05 /
GRAB, Tobias Kaiserallee 17a 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
06 /
JACOB, Andreas Dieckbornstrasse 44 30449 Hannover / DE | |||
07 /
SEIFERMANN, Stefan Hardkopfweg 3 77815 Brühl / DE | |||
08 /
VOLZ, Daniel Roonstr. 7 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
09 /
MYDLAK, Mathias Sopienstr. 56 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Representative(s) | Hoppe, Georg Johannes Darani Anwaltskanzlei Hohenzollerndamm 117 14199 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/48] | Hoppe, Georg Johannes Darani Anwaltskanzlei Beuckestrasse 20 14163 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 16702348.0 | 20.01.2016 | [2017/48] | WO2016EP51145 | Priority number, date | EP20150151870 | 20.01.2015 Original published format: EP 15151870 | EP20150168299 | 20.05.2015 Original published format: EP 15168299 | [2017/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016116510 | Date: | 28.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3247768 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3247768 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/06, H01L51/50, H01L51/00 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
C09K11/06 (EP);
H10K85/615 (EP);
C09K2211/1007 (EP);
C09K2211/1011 (EP);
C09K2211/1029 (EP);
C09K2211/1033 (EP);
C09K2211/1037 (EP);
C09K2211/1044 (EP);
C09K2211/1096 (EP);
H10K50/11 (EP);
H10K85/636 (EP);
H10K85/6572 (EP);
Y02E10/549 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/48] | C09K11/06, H01L51/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NAPHTHYL-SUBSTITUIERTE ORGANISCHE MOLEKÜLE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN OPTOELEKTRONISCHEN BAUELEMENTEN | [2017/48] | English: | NAPHTHYL SUBSTITUTED ORGANIC MOLECULES FOR USE IN OPTOELECTRONIC COMPONENTS | [2018/44] | French: | MOLÉCULES ORGANIQUES SUBSTITUÉES PAR NAPHTHYL DESTINÉES À ÊTRE UTILISÉES DANS DES ÉLÉMENTS DE CONSTRUCTION OPTO-ÉLECTRONIQUES | [2018/44] |
Former [2017/48] | NAPTHYL-SUBSTITUTED ORGANIC MOLECULES FOR USE IN OPTOELECTRONIC COMPONENTS | ||
Former [2017/48] | MOLÉCULES ORGANIQUES À SUBSTITUTION NAPTHYLE DESTINÉES À ÊTRE UTILISÉES DANS DES COMPOSANTS OPTOÉLECTRONIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 22.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.01.2016 | AL | 13.03.2019 | CY | 13.03.2019 | CZ | 13.03.2019 | DK | 13.03.2019 | EE | 13.03.2019 | ES | 13.03.2019 | FI | 13.03.2019 | HR | 13.03.2019 | IT | 13.03.2019 | LT | 13.03.2019 | LV | 13.03.2019 | MC | 13.03.2019 | MK | 13.03.2019 | MT | 13.03.2019 | NL | 13.03.2019 | PL | 13.03.2019 | RO | 13.03.2019 | RS | 13.03.2019 | SE | 13.03.2019 | SI | 13.03.2019 | SK | 13.03.2019 | SM | 13.03.2019 | TR | 13.03.2019 | BG | 13.06.2019 | NO | 13.06.2019 | GR | 14.06.2019 | IS | 13.07.2019 | PT | 13.07.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 20.01.2016 | |
AL | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
MT | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 13.03.2019 | |
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 13.03.2019 | |
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2118494 ; | [X]WO2010054183 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al); | [A]JP2011153276 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [A]WO2014104315 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]); | [A]WO2014146750 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [AP]US2015340623 (KAWAMURA MASAHIRO [JP], et al); |