Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3244829 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201680010573 CN201910271217 EP16702470 EP19175861 JP2017537282 KR20177022735 US2016013488W US201614996164 US201916720596 US202117482626



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2022008232Global Dossier 13.01.2022A1
Priority number Date
US201614996164 14.01.2016
US201916720596 19.12.2019
US201562104356 16.01.2015
US202117482626 23.09.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11147695Global Dossier 19.10.2021B2
US2020121481 23.04.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201614996164 14.01.2016
US201916720596 19.12.2019
US201562104356 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10524939Global Dossier 07.01.2020B2
US2016206449 21.07.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201614996164 14.01.2016
US201562104356 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR102047167BGlobal Dossier 20.11.2019B1
KR20170104581 15.09.2017A
Priority number Date
WO2016US13488 14.01.2016
US201562104356 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6423541BGlobal Dossier 14.11.2018B2
JP2018505723 01.03.2018A
Priority number Date
WO2016US13488 14.01.2016
US201562104356 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3569192Global Dossier 12.04.2023B1
EP3569192 20.11.2019A1
Priority number Date
WO2016US13488 14.01.2016
EP16702470 14.01.2016
US201562104356 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN110037827BGlobal Dossier 30.11.2021B
CN110037827 23.07.2019A
Priority number Date
CN201680010573 14.01.2016
US201562104356 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107405193BGlobal Dossier 30.04.2019B
CN107405193 28.11.2017A
Priority number Date
WO2016US13488 14.01.2016
US201562104356 16.01.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3244829Global Dossier 30.12.2020B1
EP3244829 22.11.2017A1
Priority number Date
WO2016US13488 14.01.2016
US201562104356 16.01.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2016115403Global Dossier 21.07.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201562104356 16.01.2015
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3569192