EP3253994 - CHAIN LINK AND HANDLING CHAIN HAVING A CHAIN LINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Igus GmbH Spicher Str. 1a 51147 Köln / DE | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLASE, Frank Wildphal 10 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
THEISS, Georg Mainzer Straße 3 50678 Köln / DE | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2017/50] | Application number, filing date | 16702700.2 | 01.02.2016 | [2017/50] | WO2016EP52066 | Priority number, date | DE201520100479U | 02.02.2015 Original published format: DE 202015100479 U | [2017/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016124541 | Date: | 11.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3253994 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3253994 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16G13/16 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
F16G13/16 (EP,CN,US);
B65G17/08 (EP,CN,US);
B65G17/12 (EP,CN,US);
B65G17/40 (US);
B65G17/42 (EP,CN,US);
H02G11/006 (EP,US);
H02G3/0475 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KETTENGLIED UND HANDHABUNGSKETTE MIT KETTENGLIED | [2017/50] | English: | CHAIN LINK AND HANDLING CHAIN HAVING A CHAIN LINK | [2017/50] | French: | MAILLON ET CHAÎNE DE MANUTENTION À MAILLON | [2017/50] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 31.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.04.2022 | CZ | 06.04.2022 | DK | 06.04.2022 | EE | 06.04.2022 | ES | 06.04.2022 | FI | 06.04.2022 | HR | 06.04.2022 | IT | 06.04.2022 | LT | 06.04.2022 | LV | 06.04.2022 | MC | 06.04.2022 | NL | 06.04.2022 | PL | 06.04.2022 | RO | 06.04.2022 | RS | 06.04.2022 | SE | 06.04.2022 | SI | 06.04.2022 | SK | 06.04.2022 | SM | 06.04.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.07.2022 | GR | 07.07.2022 | IS | 06.08.2022 | PT | 08.08.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/44] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | DK | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | ES | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 06.04.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3628834 (ANDERSON HOWARD A) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]US5174439 (SPANGLER MICHAEL L [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-15,17,18 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003136456 (BLASE FRANK [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,9,11-14,18* the whole document *; | [X]US2008277248 (DAMKJAER POUL ERIK [DK]) [X] 1-18 * the whole document * |