Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101949633B | Global Dossier | 18.02.2019 | B1 | KR20170103939 | 13.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP52226 | 03.02.2016 | US201514617336 | 09.02.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6416407B | Global Dossier | 31.10.2018 | B2 | JP2018507294 | 15.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP52226 | 03.02.2016 | US201514617336 | 09.02.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107428614B | Global Dossier | 27.03.2020 | B | CN107428614 | 01.12.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP52226 | 03.02.2016 | US201514617336 | 09.02.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3256532 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2018 | B1 | EP3256532 | 20.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP52226 | 03.02.2016 | US201514617336 | 09.02.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016128263 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514617336 | 09.02.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10030122 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2018 | B2 | US2016230043 | 11.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514617336 | 09.02.2015 |